This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/12/2020 at 03:25:54 (UTC).

GILLIAN JINGRAN HE VS. VICTOR ARIZMENDI

Case Summary

On 04/27/2018 GILLIAN JINGRAN HE filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against VICTOR ARIZMENDI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LORI ANN FOURNIER and MARGARET MILLER BERNAL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7098

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LORI ANN FOURNIER

MARGARET MILLER BERNAL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HE GILLIAN JINGRAN AN INDIVIDUAL

HE GILLIAN

Defendants

ARIZMENDI VICTOR AN INDIVIDUAL DBA RED

LUIS RIVERA AN INDIVIDUAL

LUIS RIVERA AN

ARIZMENDI VICTOR

ARIZMENDI VICTOR DBA RED CARPET PUEBLO REALTY DBA RED CARPET REAL ESTATE

RIVERA AN INDIVIDUAL LUIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

PAKRADOUNI VIKEN K.

PAKRADOUNI ESQ. VIKEN KRISTAPOL

PAKRADOUNI VIKEN KRISTAPOL

Defendant Attorneys

OGBURN LAW OFFICE

OGBURN ESQ. L KEITH

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 06/05/2020

6/5/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 06/05/2020

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/16/2020

4/16/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/16/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

4/16/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Order - ORDER /RULING

10/31/2019: Order - ORDER /RULING

Notice - NOTICE OF CHANGE OF IN HEARING DATE ON MOTION TO COMPEL

9/9/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF CHANGE OF IN HEARING DATE ON MOTION TO COMPEL

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION

9/9/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION

Substitution of Attorney

7/23/2019: Substitution of Attorney

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (EX-PARTE PROCEEDINGS BY DEFENDANT VICTOR ARIZMENDI FOR CONTIN...)

4/16/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (EX-PARTE PROCEEDINGS BY DEFENDANT VICTOR ARIZMENDI FOR CONTIN...)

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL DATE

4/16/2019: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL DATE

Subpoena Duces Tecum and Proof of Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM FOR PERSONAL APPEARANCE AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS. PERSON SERVED, CODY PRATT, CUSTODIAN OF RECORDS, FROM CRMLS. P

4/3/2019: Subpoena Duces Tecum and Proof of Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM FOR PERSONAL APPEARANCE AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS. PERSON SERVED, CODY PRATT, CUSTODIAN OF RECORDS, FROM CRMLS. P

Summons

4/27/2018: Summons

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Demurrer

6/11/2018: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Demurrer

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Request for Correction

6/12/2018: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Request for Correction

Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2018-07-24 00:00:00

7/24/2018: Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2018-07-24 00:00:00

Case Management Statement

11/6/2018: Case Management Statement

Order - Order Trial Setting Order

11/8/2018: Order - Order Trial Setting Order

Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint -

9/19/2018: Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint -

Order -

7/24/2018: Order -

40 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2020
  • Hearing12/04/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department F at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • Hearing12/04/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department F at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Order to Show Cause Re: entry of Default Judgment as to Defendant Luis Rivera

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • Docketat 10:30 AM in Department F; Trial Setting Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • Docketat 1:59 PM in Department F; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Gillian He (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department F; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department F; Trial Setting Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
78 More Docket Entries
  • 06/11/2018
  • DocketDemurrer; Filed by Victor Arizmendi (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl (AS TO VICTOR ARIXMENDI, an individual dba RED CARPET PUEBLO REALTY AND RED CARPET PUEBLO REAL ESTATE ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • DocketDemurrer; Filed by Defendant, & Defendant in Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by Gillian He (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • DocketSummons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Gillian He (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: VC067098    Hearing Date: October 31, 2019    Dept: SEC

HE v. ARIZMENDI

CASE NO.:  VC067098

HEARING:  10/31/19

JUDGE: MARGARET M. BERNAL

#8

TENTATIVE ORDER

Plaintiff GILLIAN JINGRAN HE’s unopposed motion to compel further responses to Form Interrogatories (set one) from Defendant VICTOR ARIZMENDI (in pro per) is GRANTED.

Moving Party to give Notice.

No Opposition filed as of October 29, 2019.

“If the propounding party, on receipt of a response to interrogatories, deems that (1) an answer to a particular interrogatory is…incomplete…or (3) an objection to an interrogatory is without merit or too general, that party may move for an order compelling further response.” (CCP §2030.300(a).)

Plaintiff’s Motion has properly put in issue the objections and deficiencies in Defendant’s Responses to Form Interrogatories (set one). As of October 29, 2019, no Opposition has been filed. The Court has reviewed Defendant’s responses and finds that Defendant has not justified the objections asserted therein.

Defendant VICTOR ARIZMENDI is ORDERED to provide further verified responses to FI Nos. 1.1, 2.1, 202, 2.5, 2.6, 2.7, 2.8, 2.9, 2.10, 2.11, 3.1, 3.2, 3.3, 3.4, 3.5, 3.6, 3.7, 4.1, 12.1, 12.2, 12.3, 12.6, 14.1, 14.2, and 15.1, no later than 15 days from October 31, 2019. This date may be extended pursuant to agreement of the parties.

Defendant VICTOR ARIZMENDI is ORDERED to pay Plaintiff GILLIAN JINGRAN HE and her counsel of record sanctions in the amount of $1,320.00 ($300/hr. x 4 hrs.) ($120 costs) no later than 15 days from October 31, 2019. This date may be extended pursuant to agreement of the parties.