This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/03/2022 at 10:15:38 (UTC).

GILLETT, SUSAN J. - CONSERVATORSHIP

Case Summary

On 01/14/2021 GILLETT, SUSAN J - CONSERVATORSHIP was filed as a Probate - Conservatorship lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MAY, GUS T. and PRIVER, MARK S.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0508

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Conservatorship

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MAY, GUS T.

PRIVER, MARK S.

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court and Petitioners

GILLETT SUSAN J.

WALMER MEGAN

ANSON BRIAN W.

Conservator and Not Classified By Court

WALMER MEGAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

CARICO CHRISTOPHER DANIEL

Not Classified By Court Attorney

FUKUSHIMA PAUL JAY

 

Court Documents

Declaration - Declaration in Support of Request for Continuance

2/10/2022: Declaration - Declaration in Support of Request for Continuance

Request - Continuance (Granted)

2/15/2022: Request - Continuance (Granted)

Notice - Continuance - Notice of Ruling and Continued Hearing

2/16/2022: Notice - Continuance - Notice of Ruling and Continued Hearing

Request - Request by CAC

3/23/2022: Request - Request by CAC

Supplement - First Supplement to Petition for Appointment of Probate Conservator of the Estate

5/16/2022: Supplement - First Supplement to Petition for Appointment of Probate Conservator of the Estate

Minute Order

5/18/2022: Minute Order

Ex Parte - Application - Ex Parte Application for Deposit of Funds in Blocked Account

5/31/2022: Ex Parte - Application - Ex Parte Application for Deposit of Funds in Blocked Account

Declaration - Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application for Deposit of Funds in Blocked Account

5/31/2022: Declaration - Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application for Deposit of Funds in Blocked Account

Ex Parte - Order

6/2/2022: Ex Parte - Order

Notice - Ruling - Notice of Ruling and Continued Hearing on Petition for Appointment of Conservator

8/17/2021: Notice - Ruling - Notice of Ruling and Continued Hearing on Petition for Appointment of Conservator

Notice - Notice of Unavailability of Counsel

8/27/2021: Notice - Notice of Unavailability of Counsel

Declaration - ISO of Request for Continuance

8/11/2021: Declaration - ISO of Request for Continuance

Request - Continuance (Granted)

8/12/2021: Request - Continuance (Granted)

Order - Confirming Sale

7/8/2021: Order - Confirming Sale

Minute Order

7/7/2021: Minute Order

Minute Order

6/29/2021: Minute Order

Bond

6/30/2021: Bond

Minute Order

6/11/2021: Minute Order

44 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/03/2023
  • Hearing07/03/2023 at 8:30 AM in Probate Department 2D at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • Hearing09/14/2022 at 8:30 AM in Probate Department 2D at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketEx Parte - Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketDeclaration (Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application for Deposit of Funds in Blocked Account ); Filed by Nominee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketEx Parte - Application (Ex Parte Application for Deposit of Funds in Blocked Account ); Filed by Nominee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • Docketin Probate Department 2D, Priver, Mark S., Presiding; Appointment Hearing - Conservator - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketConservatorship Appointment Petition Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketDISP: Granted-Initial Petition-After Crt Hrg/Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
76 More Docket Entries
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketDuties of Conservator/Acknowledgment of Receipt of Handbook; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketNotification - Cons/Guard Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketCAC Appointment Required

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketCitation; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketDoctor's Capacity Declaration; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketPetition - Appoint a Temporary Conservator (Subsequent); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketConfidential Screening Form; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketPetition - Appoint Conservator of Estate (Initial); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketConsent (Megan Walmer ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketConsent (Megan Walmer ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CARICO CHRISTOPHER DANIEL