This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/28/2023 at 08:15:35 (UTC).

GILES, KEMPILTON LOUIS - DECEDENT

Case Summary

On 01/13/2022 GILES, KEMPILTON LOUIS - DECEDENT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are PRIVER, MARK S. and MAY, GUS T.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0400

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

PRIVER, MARK S.

MAY, GUS T.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ROGERS STELLA

Claimant

BANK OF AMERICA N.A.

Decedent

GILES KEMPILTON LOUIS

Interested Parties

GETER OLIVIA

GRAY JIMMIE M.

KRIZ JERRI MARIE

THAXTON RICHARD VINCENT

Not Classified By Court

GEORGE WILLIAM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

KINCHELOE JUSTIN MICHAEL

Interested Party Attorney

DYBENS BRUCE ALAN

 

Court Documents

Inventory & Appraisal - Inventory and Appraisal

12/27/2022: Inventory & Appraisal - Inventory and Appraisal

Letters (Initial)

12/12/2022: Letters (Initial)

Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative

12/9/2022: Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative

PR_General Probate - PR-Notice- Rejection

12/2/2022: PR_General Probate - PR-Notice- Rejection

Bond - Liberty Mutual

11/23/2022: Bond - Liberty Mutual

Nunc Pro Tunc Minute Order

10/20/2022: Nunc Pro Tunc Minute Order

Order - Appointing Personal Representative

10/20/2022: Order - Appointing Personal Representative

Minute Order

9/16/2022: Minute Order

Supplement - Third Supplement to Petition for Probate

9/9/2022: Supplement - Third Supplement to Petition for Probate

Proof of Publication

8/25/2022: Proof of Publication

Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

7/26/2022: Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

Supplement - Second Supplement

8/4/2022: Supplement - Second Supplement

Notice - Petition to Administer Estate

8/8/2022: Notice - Petition to Administer Estate

Notice - Hearing - 9/16/22

8/8/2022: Notice - Hearing - 9/16/22

Minute Order

7/22/2022: Minute Order

Notice - Petition to Administer Estate - 7/22/22

7/7/2022: Notice - Petition to Administer Estate - 7/22/22

Supplement - Supplement

6/2/2022: Supplement - Supplement

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/16/2024
  • Hearing02/16/2024 at 8:30 AM in Probate Department 2D at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; OSC Re Petition for Final Distribution or Status Report

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketInventory & Appraisal (Inventory and Appraisal ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketLetters (Initial); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities - Personal Representative; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketBond (Liberty Mutual ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • Docketin Probate Department 2D, May, Gus T., Presiding; Nunc Pro Tunc Order Hearing - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketOrder - Appointing Personal Representative; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketNunc Pro Tunc Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • Docketin Probate Department 2D, May, Gus T., Presiding; Appointment Hearing - Decedent's Estate - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketPetition Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketSupplement (Supplement ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketRequest - Special Notice; Filed by Attorney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • Docketin Probate Department 2D, Priver, Mark S., Presiding; Appointment Hearing - Decedent's Estate - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketCreditor's Claim; Filed by Claimant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • Docketin Probate Department 2D, Priver, Mark S., Presiding; Appointment Hearing - Decedent's Estate - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketPetition - Letters of Administration (Initial); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less