This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/04/2022 at 09:55:08 (UTC).

GILBERTO REYES VS NEW PENN FINANCIAL LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/14/2022 GILBERTO REYES filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against NEW PENN FINANCIAL LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0798

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

REYES GILBERTO

Defendants

NEW PENN FINANCIAL LLC DBA SHELLPOINT MORTGAGE SERVICING

THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON FKA THE BANK OF NEW YORK AS TRUSTEE FOR THE CERTIFICATEHOLDERS OF THE CWABS INC. ASSET-BACKED CERTIFICATES SERIES 2004-14

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CARA ANTHONY P.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

6/14/2022: Complaint

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION

6/14/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/14/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/14/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/14/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/14/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

6/20/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

6/20/2022: Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2022
  • Hearing10/12/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department A at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by GILBERTO REYES (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by GILBERTO REYES (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketDeclaration (DECLARATION); Filed by GILBERTO REYES (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by GILBERTO REYES (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by GILBERTO REYES (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by GILBERTO REYES (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NEW PENN FINANCIAL, LLC D/B/A/ SHELLPOINT MORTGAGE SERVICING is a litigant

Latest cases where The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CARA ANTHONY P.