This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/15/2021 at 01:35:47 (UTC).

GILBERTO BARRETO CORREA, ET AL. VS MARK JOHN WILSON, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/03/2021 GILBERTO BARRETO CORREA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MARK JOHN WILSON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0455

  • Filing Date:

    06/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BARRETO ROSSY

CORREA GILBERTO BARRETO

Defendants

BIRSNER MARY LOU

WILSON MARK JOHN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MICHAEL ETHAN O.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2024
  • Hearing05/23/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department A14 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • Hearing08/11/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department A14 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • Hearing07/28/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department A14 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by GILBERTO BARRETO CORREA (Plaintiff); ROSSY BARRETO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by GILBERTO BARRETO CORREA (Plaintiff); ROSSY BARRETO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by GILBERTO BARRETO CORREA (Plaintiff); ROSSY BARRETO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MICHAEL ETHAN OHAD