This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/04/2023 at 18:18:29 (UTC).

GILBERT, ASHLEY - MINOR'S COMPROMISE

Case Summary

On 10/06/2022 GILBERT, ASHLEY - MINOR'S COMPROMISE was filed as a Probate - Minor Compromise Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ROSENBLOOM, JONATHAN L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9989

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Minor Compromise Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ROSENBLOOM, JONATHAN L

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GILBERT BEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

MALIN GARRY SCOTT

 

Court Documents

Petition - Approve Minor's Compromise (Expedited)

10/6/2022: Petition - Approve Minor's Compromise (Expedited)

Proposed Order - Deposit Funds Expedited

10/6/2022: Proposed Order - Deposit Funds Expedited

Proposed Order - Deposit Funds Expedited - Order - Deposit Funds (Expedited)

10/10/2022: Proposed Order - Deposit Funds Expedited - Order - Deposit Funds (Expedited)

PR_General Probate - Proposed Order Rejected

10/10/2022: PR_General Probate - Proposed Order Rejected

PR_General Probate - Proposed Order Rejected

10/10/2022: PR_General Probate - Proposed Order Rejected

Order - Deposit Funds Expedited

10/19/2022: Order - Deposit Funds Expedited

Order - Approving Compromise of Claim (Expedited)

10/19/2022: Order - Approving Compromise of Claim (Expedited)

Receipt - Acknowledgment of Ord for Deposit in Blocked Acct.

11/10/2022: Receipt - Acknowledgment of Ord for Deposit in Blocked Acct.

Minute Order

12/29/2022: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/29/2022
  • Docketin Probate Department 79, Rosenbloom, Jonathan L, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Hearing - Held - OSC Hearing Off Calendar

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Minor

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketReceipt - Acknowledgment of Ord for Deposit in Blocked Acct.; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketOrder - Deposit Funds Expedited

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketOrder - Approving Compromise of Claim (Expedited)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketDISP: Expedited Minor's Compromise Approved

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketRejected Proposed Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketProposed Order - Deposit Funds Expedited (Order - Deposit Funds (Expedited) ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketRejected Proposed Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketPetition - Approve Minor's Compromise (Expedited); Filed by Attorney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketProposed Order - Deposit Funds Expedited; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less