This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/11/2022 at 15:26:22 (UTC).

GIL SANDOVAL VS ESTATE OF SUSANA LOPEZ, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/28/2021 GIL SANDOVAL filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against ESTATE OF SUSANA LOPEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK V. MOONEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5614

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARK V. MOONEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SANDOVAL GIL

Defendants

ESTATE OF SUSANA LOPEZ

SANDOVAL CARLOS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

SANZO FRANK A.

BARTH JASON EDWARD

LOA RICHARD ALVAREZ

 

Court Documents

Complaint

9/28/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/28/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/28/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/28/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/28/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Personal Service

11/16/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

11/16/2021: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Answer

1/19/2022: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

1/19/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Case Management Statement

1/14/2022: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

1/20/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Answer

2/14/2022: Answer

Case Management Statement

3/9/2022: Case Management Statement

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2022
  • Hearing03/23/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 68 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • Hearing03/23/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 68 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by ESTATE of SUSANA LOPEZ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by ESTATE of SUSANA LOPEZ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by CARLOS SANDOVAL (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by GIL SANDOVAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by GIL SANDOVAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketProof of Mailing (Substituted Service); Filed by GIL SANDOVAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by GIL SANDOVAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by GIL SANDOVAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by GIL SANDOVAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by GIL SANDOVAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SANZO FRANK A