This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/02/2023 at 01:54:36 (UTC).

GIL BENJAMIN WALTON VS KAISER PERMANENTE, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/09/2022 GIL BENJAMIN WALTON filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against KAISER PERMANENTE,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DOUGLAS W. STERN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9404

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DOUGLAS W. STERN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WALTON GIL BENJAMIN

Defendants

KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITALS

KAISER PERMANENTE

KAISER PERMANENTE BALDWIN PARK MEDICAL CENTER

KENNEDY ARTHUR

KAISER PERMANENTE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DAVID JOHN

Defendant Attorney

HEFZI NEDA

 

Court Documents

Answer - ANSWER DEFENDANT KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITALS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF GIL BENJAMIN WALTONS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

1/13/2023: Answer - ANSWER DEFENDANT KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITALS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF GIL BENJAMIN WALTONS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

12/15/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Unknown - DECLARATION OF DEMURRING PARTY IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION

12/12/2022: Unknown - DECLARATION OF DEMURRING PARTY IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION

Case Management Statement

12/5/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

11/30/2022: Case Management Statement

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

11/15/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

11/15/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST) (2ND) (3RD)

10/28/2022: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST) (2ND) (3RD)

Proof of Personal Service

10/31/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Unknown - DECLARATION OF DEMURRING PARTY IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION

10/28/2022: Unknown - DECLARATION OF DEMURRING PARTY IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

10/27/2022: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Request for Dismissal

10/26/2022: Request for Dismissal

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

10/14/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

10/4/2022: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Proof of Personal Service

9/13/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

9/13/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

9/13/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Complaint

9/9/2022: Complaint

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2024
  • Hearing03/25/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 68 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2024
  • Hearing03/15/2024 at 09:00 AM in Department 68 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketAnswer DEFENDANT KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITALS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF GIL BENJAMIN WALTONS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; Filed by: Kaiser Foundation Hospitals (Defendant); As to: Gil Benjamin Walton (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketJury Trial 15-16 day est. scheduled for 03/25/2024 at 10:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 68

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 03/15/2024 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 68

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 12/15/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 68 updated: Result Date to 12/15/2022; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketDeclaration of Demurring Party in Support of Automatic Extension; Filed by: Kaiser Foundation Hospitals (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Kaiser Foundation Hospitals (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Gil Benjamin Walton (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketAddress for John David (Attorney) null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 12/15/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 68

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Gil Benjamin Walton (Plaintiff); As to: Kaiser Permanente (Defendant); Kaiser Foundation Hospitals (Defendant); Kaiser Permanente Baldwin Park Medical Center (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Gil Benjamin Walton (Plaintiff); As to: Kaiser Permanente (Defendant); Kaiser Foundation Hospitals (Defendant); Kaiser Permanente Baldwin Park Medical Center (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Gil Benjamin Walton (Plaintiff); As to: Kaiser Permanente (Defendant); Kaiser Foundation Hospitals (Defendant); Kaiser Permanente Baldwin Park Medical Center (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Mark V. Mooney in Department 68 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less