This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/25/2022 at 02:23:12 (UTC).

GIL ALCHADEFF VS WILL EVANS, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/12/2021 GIL ALCHADEFF filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against WILL EVANS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is AUDRA MORI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1353

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

AUDRA MORI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALCHADEFF GIL

Defendants

EVANS ROBERT

EVANS WILL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

SMITH BRENDAN A.

Other Attorneys

LAMB JEFFREY

 

Court Documents

Complaint

1/12/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/12/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/12/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/12/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Answer

2/5/2021: Answer

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

2/10/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

PI General Order

2/10/2021: PI General Order

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

4/14/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING RE DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL

10/13/2021: Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING RE DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND ...)

10/13/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND ...)

Notice - NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING OF MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFFS RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, (SET ONE)

8/17/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING OF MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFFS RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, (SET ONE)

Notice - NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING OF MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFFS RESPONSES TO DEMAND FOR INSPECTION AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, (SET ONE)

8/17/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING OF MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFFS RESPONSES TO DEMAND FOR INSPECTION AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, (SET ONE)

Notice - NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING OF MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFFS RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES, (SET ONE)

8/17/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING OF MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFFS RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES, (SET ONE)

Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES (SET ONE); REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS OF $597.00; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORI

7/13/2021: Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES (SET ONE); REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS OF $597.00; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORI

Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFFS RESPONSES TO DEMAND FOR INSPECTION AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS (SET ONE); REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS OF $59

7/13/2021: Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFFS RESPONSES TO DEMAND FOR INSPECTION AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS (SET ONE); REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS OF $59

Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFFS RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES (SET ONE); REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS OF $597.00; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AN

7/13/2021: Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFFS RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES (SET ONE); REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS OF $597.00; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AN

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2024
  • Hearing01/09/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • Hearing07/12/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • Hearing06/28/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Will Evans (Defendant); Robert Evans (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 31, Audra Mori, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel (DEFENDANT?S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF?S RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES (SET ONE)) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 31, Audra Mori, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel (DEFENDANT?S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES (SET ONE)) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 31, Audra Mori, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel (DEFENDANT?S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF?S RESPONSES TO DEMAND FOR INSPECTION AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS (SET ONE)) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 31, Audra Mori, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel (DEFENDANT?S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF?S RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES (SET ONE)) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 31, Audra Mori, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel (DEFENDANT?S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF?S RESPONSES TO DEMAND FOR INSPECTION AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS (SET ONE)) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 31, Audra Mori, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel (DEFENDANT?S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES (SET ONE)) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketMotion to Compel (DEFENDANT?S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF?S RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES (SET ONE); REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS OF $597.00; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF BRENDAN SMITH, IN SUPPORT THEREOF); Filed by Robert Evans (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketMotion to Compel (DEFENDANT?S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES (SET ONE); REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS OF $597.00; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF BRENDAN SMITH IN SUPPORT THEREOF); Filed by Robert Evans (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketMotion to Compel (DEFENDANT?S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF?S RESPONSES TO DEMAND FOR INSPECTION AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS (SET ONE); REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS OF $597.00; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF BRENDAN SMITH, IN SUPPORT THEREO); Filed by Robert Evans (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Will Evans (Defendant); Robert Evans (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Gil Alchadeff (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Gil Alchadeff (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Gil Alchadeff (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: *******1353 Hearing Date: October 13, 2021 Dept: 31

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

GIL ALCHADEFF,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

ROBERT EVANS, ET AL.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

CASE NO: *******1353

[TENTATIVE] ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT’S MOTIONS TO COMPEL

Dept. 31

1:30 p.m.

October 13, 2021

Defendant, Robert Evans (“Defendant”) propounded form interrogatories, special interrogatories, and request for production of documents (“RPDs”), sets one, on Plaintiff, Gil Alchadeff (“Plaintiff”) on February 5, 2021. To date, despite attempts to meet and confer, Plaintiff has not served responses. Defendant therefore seeks an order compelling Plaintiff to respond, without objections, to the outstanding discovery and to pay sanctions. The court notes that while Defendant’s motions were originally set for November 18, 2021, on August 17, 2021, Defendant filed and served notice of the motions being rescheduled for October 13, 2021, on Plaintiff.

Defendant’s motions are unopposed and granted. Plaintiff is ordered to serve verified responses to form interrogatories, special interrogatories, and RPDs, without objections, within ten days. (CCP ;; 2030.290(a),(b), 2031.300(a),(b).)

Sanctions are mandatory. (CCP ;; 2030.290(c), 2031.300(c).) Defendant seeks sanctions in the amount of $597 for each motion. Because no opposition was filed and no reply necessary, the request is unreasonable The court awards Defendant one hour for preparing each form motion to compel [three hours total] and one hour to appear at the hearing- but awards this time once- all at the requested rate $179 per hour, for a total of $716 in attorney’s fees. Further, the court awards Defendant three motion filing fees of $60, or $180 total, as costs.

Defendant seeks sanctions against Plaintiff and Plaintiff’s attorney of record. Defendant does not describe any conduct warranting sanctions against Plaintiff personally. Sanctions are imposed against Plaintiff’s attorney of record only. Plaintiff’s counsel is ordered to pay sanctions to Defendants, by and through counsel of record, in the total amount of $896.00, within twenty days.

Defendant is ordered to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept31@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org. If the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar. If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative. If the parties do not submit on the tentative, they should arrange to appear remotely.

Dated this 13th day of October, 2021

Hon. Audra Mori

Judge of the Superior Court


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAMB JEFFREY