Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/20/2021 at 02:41:26 (UTC).

GIBBI TKATCH, ET AL. VS MEDTRONIC MINIMED, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION WITH ITS PRINCIPAL PLACE OF BUSINESS IN CALIFORNIA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/08/2021 GIBBI TKATCH filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against MEDTRONIC MINIMED, INC , A DELAWARE CORPORATION WITH ITS PRINCIPAL PLACE OF BUSINESS IN CALIFORNIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ELIHU M. BERLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3395

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ELIHU M. BERLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JONES MELISSIA

WELDON KIMBERLY

TKATCH GIBBI

BODEN CASSANDRA

CONCANNON HEATHER

JONES JASPER

TKATCH ANNA

CONCANNON MICHAEL

WELDON KENNETH

Defendants

MEDTRONIC INC. A MINNESOTA CORPORATION

MEDTRONIC MINIMED INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION WITH ITS PRINCIPAL PLACE OF BUSINESS IN CALIFORNIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COWPER MOZE

 

Court Documents

Proof of Personal Service

7/7/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

7/8/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/17/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR S.G.W.

4/8/2021: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR S.G.W.

PI General Order

4/22/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

4/22/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: RELATED CASES)

5/6/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: RELATED CASES)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: RELATED CASES) OF 05/06/2021

5/6/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: RELATED CASES) OF 05/06/2021

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/8/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/8/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

4/8/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2021
  • Hearing08/19/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 6 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Gibbi Tkatch (Plaintiff); Anna Tkatch (Plaintiff); Michael Concannon (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Gibbi Tkatch (Plaintiff); Anna Tkatch (Plaintiff); Michael Concannon (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Gibbi Tkatch (Plaintiff); Anna Tkatch (Plaintiff); Michael Concannon (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • Docketat 3:24 PM in Department 6, Elihu M. Berle, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Related Cases) of 05/06/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: Related Cases)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for S.G.W.); Filed by Gibbi Tkatch (Plaintiff); Anna Tkatch (Plaintiff); Michael Concannon (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Gibbi Tkatch (Plaintiff); Anna Tkatch (Plaintiff); Michael Concannon (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Gibbi Tkatch (Plaintiff); Anna Tkatch (Plaintiff); Michael Concannon (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MEDTRONIC MINIMED INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Medtronic, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer COWPER MOZE