This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/15/2020 at 09:02:05 (UTC).

GIANLUCA PALAMARA, ET AL. VS HUNTINGTON HOSPITAL, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/15/2018 GIANLUCA PALAMARA filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against HUNTINGTON HOSPITAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are YOLANDA OROZCO, AMY D. HOGUE and LAURA A. SEIGLE. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1377

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

YOLANDA OROZCO

AMY D. HOGUE

LAURA A. SEIGLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PALAMARA GIANLUCA

SANTOS DINA LEE

PALAMARA ROSE SANTOS

SANTOS PALAMAR ROSE

Defendants

HUNTINGTON HOSPITAL

HEALTH CARE PARTNERS;

FRANCES TENG M.S.;

ALESSANDRO OBSTETRICS AND GYNECOLOGY

HEALTHCARE PARTNERS AFFILIATES MEDICAL GROUP ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS HEALTHCARE PARTNERS AND ALESSANDRO OBSTERTRICS AND GYNECOLOGY AND FRANCES TENG M.D

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SIGELMAN KENNETH MITCHELL

Defendant Attorneys

REBACK ROBERT C

BUTTS MELANIE

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

1/15/2020: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

1/17/2020: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Answer

2/26/2019: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

3/13/2019: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer - ANSWER TO PLTF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

3/13/2019: Answer - ANSWER TO PLTF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Answer - ANSWER TO PLTF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

3/13/2019: Answer - ANSWER TO PLTF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Demand for Jury Trial

3/13/2019: Demand for Jury Trial

Proof of Personal Service

2/4/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/8/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/8/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem for Gianluca

1/11/2019: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem for Gianluca

Summons - (Amended)

1/14/2019: Summons - (Amended)

Complaint - (Amended)

12/31/2018: Complaint - (Amended)

Summons - Summons on Complaint

12/13/2018: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Rejection - Ex Parte Application Without Hearing - Notice of Rejection - Ex Parte Application Without Hearing for Guardian ad litem

12/7/2018: Notice of Rejection - Ex Parte Application Without Hearing - Notice of Rejection - Ex Parte Application Without Hearing for Guardian ad litem

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Extension of Time to serv...)

12/6/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Extension of Time to serv...)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/15/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by Gianluca Palamara (Plaintiff); DINA LEE SANTOS (Plaintiff); Rose Santos Palamara (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Gianluca Palamara (Plaintiff); DINA LEE SANTOS (Plaintiff); Rose Santos Palamara (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Healthcare Partners Affiliates Medical Group, erroneously sued as Healthcare Partners and Alessandro Obstertrics and Gynecology and Frances Teng, M.D (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 4B; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (of defendant Frances Teng, M.D. for an order to continue trial and all corresponding dates) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketEx Parte Application (of defendant Frances Teng, M.D. for an order to continue trial and all corresponding dates); Filed by Healthcare Partners Affiliates Medical Group, erroneously sued as Healthcare Partners and Alessandro Obstertrics and Gynecology and Frances Teng, M.D (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application of defendant Frances Teng, M....)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Gianluca Palamara (Plaintiff); Rose Santos Palamara (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Healthcare Partners Affiliates Medical Group, erroneously sued as Healthcare Partners and Alessandro Obstertrics and Gynecology and Frances Teng, M.D (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Huntington Hospital (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • DocketAnswer (to Pltf First Amended Complaint); Filed by Huntington Hospital (Defendant); Healthcare Partners Affiliates Medical Group, erroneously sued as Healthcare Partners and Alessandro Obstertrics and Gynecology and Frances Teng, M.D (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 01/14/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Amended Complaint (1st))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Gianluca); Filed by Gianluca Palamara (Plaintiff); Gianluca Palamara (Plaintiff); DINA LEE SANTOS (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 7, Amy D. Hogue, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (for Extension of Time to serve Pleading) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • DocketMinute Order ((Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Extension of Time to serv...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Gianluca Palamara (Plaintiff); DINA LEE SANTOS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Gianluca Palamara (Plaintiff); Gianluca Palamara (Plaintiff); DINA LEE SANTOS (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Gianluca Palamara (Plaintiff); Gianluca Palamara (Plaintiff); DINA LEE SANTOS (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • DocketComplaint ((1st)); Filed by Gianluca Palamara (Plaintiff); Gianluca Palamara (Plaintiff); DINA LEE SANTOS (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • DocketNotice of Rejection - Ex Parte Application Without Hearing (for Guardian ad litem); Filed by DINA LEE SANTOS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HEALTH CARE PARTNERS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where HEALTHCARE PARTNERS AFFILIATES is a litigant

Latest cases where HUNTINGTON HOSPITAL is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SIGELMAN KENNETH