This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/23/2021 at 08:44:38 (UTC).

GIANCARLO INCALZA VS PORSCHE DESIGN STUDIO NORTH AMERICA, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/09/2020 GIANCARLO INCALZA filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against PORSCHE DESIGN STUDIO NORTH AMERICA, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DAVID J. COWAN, RUPERT A. BYRDSONG, MALCOLM MACKEY and KEVIN C. BRAZILE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2875

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

DAVID J. COWAN

RUPERT A. BYRDSONG

MALCOLM MACKEY

KEVIN C. BRAZILE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

INCALZA GIANCARLO

Defendants

NOVAK GERHARD

PORSCHE DESIGN STUDIO

VOLKSWAGEN AG

PORSCHE DESIGN STUDIO NORTH AMERICA A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

PORSCHE DESIGN OF AMERICA INC.

DR. ING. H.C. F. PORSCHE AG

PORSCHE CARS NORTH AMERICA INC.

ENGELN KARSTEN VON

PORSCHE LIZENZ UND HANDELSGESELLSCHAFT MBH & CO. KG

MARTIN KATHY

MANSFIELD JOHN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LIVSHITS LEONARD E.

Defendant Attorneys

PERSOFF JOSEPH

HABASHY CHRISTOPHER

MACKEY THOMAS G.

Other Attorneys

SHEGERIAN CARNEY R. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

10/27/2021: Request for Dismissal

Answer - ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

6/3/2021: Answer - ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

Substitution of Attorney

5/26/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney

5/26/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney

5/26/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney

5/26/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney

5/26/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

5/4/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

5/5/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

5/5/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

5/5/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

5/5/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

5/5/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

5/6/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Proof of Service by Mail

4/30/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

4/21/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 04/21/2021

4/21/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 04/21/2021

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/22/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

58 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2022
  • Hearing10/11/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 55 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • Hearing09/30/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 55 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Giancarlo Incalza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketAnswer (TO PLAINTIFF?S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES); Filed by Porsche Design Studio North America, a California corporation (Defendant); Porsche Design Of America, Inc. (Defendant); Porsche Cars North America, Inc. (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Porsche Design Studio North America, a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Porsche Design Studio North America, a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Porsche Design Studio North America, a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Porsche Design Studio North America, a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Porsche Design Studio North America, a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Giancarlo Incalza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
61 More Docket Entries
  • 12/22/2020
  • Docketat 2:06 PM in Department 20, Kevin C. Brazile, Presiding; Court Order - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ((Court Order) of 12/22/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 12/22/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by Porsche Design Of America, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Giancarlo Incalza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Giancarlo Incalza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Giancarlo Incalza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORSCHE DESIGN OF AMERICA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where PORSCHE CARS NORTH AMERICA INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant