This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/24/2021 at 23:23:25 (UTC).

GHILARY S NEGLIA BROCCA VS LOS ANGELES WORLD AIRPORTS, A PUBLIC ENTITY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/09/2021 GHILARY S NEGLIA BROCCA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against LOS ANGELES WORLD AIRPORTS, A PUBLIC ENTITY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5206

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NEGLIA BROCCA GHILARY S

Defendants

LOS ANGELES WORLD AIRPORTS A PUBLIC ENTITY

CITY OF LOS ANGELES A PUBLIC ENTITY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AIRAPETIAN STEPHAN

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/9/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

2/9/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/9/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/9/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

2/10/2021: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2024
  • Hearing02/06/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • Hearing08/09/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • Hearing07/26/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Ghilary S Neglia Brocca (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Ghilary S Neglia Brocca (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Ghilary S Neglia Brocca (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer AIRAPETIAN STEPHAN