This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/07/2021 at 11:25:44 (UTC).

GHEYVANDIAN, JERIC VS TSATURYAN, TATEVIK

Case Summary

On 07/08/2020 GHEYVANDIAN, JERIC filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against TSATURYAN, TATEVIK. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are IWASAKI, BRUCE G., SANCHEZ DUFOUR, ROBERT E., SHORT, MICHELLE and KAUFMAN, SHELLEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0979

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

IWASAKI, BRUCE G.

SANCHEZ DUFOUR, ROBERT E.

SHORT, MICHELLE

KAUFMAN, SHELLEY

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GHEYVANDIAN JERIC

Respondent

TSATURYAN TATEVIK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

NAGEL JENNIFER LYN

MANCINI STEPHEN CRAIG

Respondent Attorneys

SKLARK WESLEY RICHARD

WALLER MARSHALL WILLIAM II

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service - Mail - Order after hearing

9/27/2021: Proof of Service - Mail - Order after hearing

Order - After Hearing

9/3/2021: Order - After Hearing

Minute Order

8/16/2021: Minute Order

Minute Order

8/6/2021: Minute Order

Notice - Trial, MSC and Orders - Trial readiness and MSC

8/6/2021: Notice - Trial, MSC and Orders - Trial readiness and MSC

Order - Home court family code section 217 - hearing and TSC orders

8/6/2021: Order - Home court family code section 217 - hearing and TSC orders

Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

6/22/2021: Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

Proof of Service - Order After Hearing

6/8/2021: Proof of Service - Order After Hearing

Order - After Hearing

5/18/2021: Order - After Hearing

Notice - Unavailability of Counsel

5/13/2021: Notice - Unavailability of Counsel

Proof of Service - Mail - [Proposed] Order After Hearing

4/23/2021: Proof of Service - Mail - [Proposed] Order After Hearing

Objection - and motion to strike

4/7/2021: Objection - and motion to strike

Reply - to Respondent responsive decl.

4/7/2021: Reply - to Respondent responsive decl.

Order - on Motion to Strike

4/13/2021: Order - on Motion to Strike

Minute Order

4/13/2021: Minute Order

Minute Order

4/13/2021: Minute Order

Proof of Service - Responsive Declaration to RFO

3/30/2021: Proof of Service - Responsive Declaration to RFO

Responsive Declaration - To RFO

3/30/2021: Responsive Declaration - To RFO

66 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2022
  • Hearing02/14/2022 at 8:30 AM in Department 2 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Trial Readiness Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • Hearing01/18/2022 at 8:30 AM in Department 18 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Mandatory Settlement Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Mail (Order after hearing ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketOrder - After Hearing; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department F48, Sanchez DuFour, Robert E., Presiding; Request for Order Hearing - Held - Order Made

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
91 More Docket Entries
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketRequest - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (w/in Existing Case); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketRequest - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (w/in Existing Case); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109) (Denied ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SKLARK WESLEY RICHARD

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WALLER MARSHALL WILLIAM II