This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/20/2022 at 14:42:00 (UTC).

GHAZAR SHABAZYAN, ET AL. VS BERKSHIRE HATHAWAY HOMESTATE INSURANCE COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/20/2022 GHAZAR SHABAZYAN, filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against BERKSHIRE HATHAWAY HOMESTATE INSURANCE COMPANY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JON R. TAKASUGI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3508

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GOLD POINT TOWING INC.

SHABAZYAN GHAZAR

Defendants

BERKSHIRE HATHAWAY HOMESTATE INSURANCE COMPANY

COVERHOUND LLC DBA COVERHOUND INSURANCE SOLUTIONS

REWOOD FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

COVERHOUND LLC. DOE 1

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BYBERG GREGORY B.

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

7/20/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

7/20/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

7/20/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/20/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/20/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/20/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

7/20/2022: Complaint

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE]

7/27/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE]

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/27/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

11/8/2022: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Case Management Statement

11/10/2022: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

11/17/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2023
  • Hearing02/24/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 17 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 11/17/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 17 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 02/24/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: GHAZAR SHABAZYAN (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by: GHAZAR SHABAZYAN (Plaintiff); GOLD POINT TOWING INC., (Plaintiff); As to: COVERHOUND, LLC. (DOE 1) (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 11/17/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 17

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice of Case Management Conference]; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 02/24/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 17

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Gregory B. Byberg (Attorney): First Name changed from gregory to Gregory; Last Name changed from byberg to Byberg; Middle Name changed from b to B.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketAddress for Gregory B. Byberg (Attorney) null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Jon R. Takasugi in Department 17 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: GHAZAR SHABAZYAN (Plaintiff); GOLD POINT TOWING INC., (Plaintiff); As to: BERKSHIRE HATHAWAY HOMESTATE INSURANCE COMPANY (Defendant); REWOOD FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY (Defendant); COVERHOUND LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: GHAZAR SHABAZYAN (Plaintiff); GOLD POINT TOWING INC., (Plaintiff); As to: BERKSHIRE HATHAWAY HOMESTATE INSURANCE COMPANY (Defendant); REWOOD FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY (Defendant); COVERHOUND LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: GHAZAR SHABAZYAN (Plaintiff); GOLD POINT TOWING INC., (Plaintiff); As to: BERKSHIRE HATHAWAY HOMESTATE INSURANCE COMPANY (Defendant); REWOOD FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY (Defendant); COVERHOUND LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BERKSHIRE HATHAWAY HOMESTATE COMPANIES is a litigant

Latest cases where REDWOOD FIRE & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY ADMINISTERED BY BERKSHIRE HATHAWAY HOMESTATE COMPANIES is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BYBERG GREGORY B. ESQ.