This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/26/2023 at 11:19:26 (UTC).

GHAZALEH HAFIZI VS FCA US, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/31/2023 GHAZALEH HAFIZI filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FCA US, LLC,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0425

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HAFIZI GHAZALEH

Defendants

FCA US LLC

RUSSELL WESTBROOK CHRYSLER DODGE JEEP RAM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DOLIN TIONNA GRACE

Defendant Attorney

HUGRET SPENCER P

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/31/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/31/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/31/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/31/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

1/31/2023: Complaint

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/2/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

2/2/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

3/1/2023: Answer

Answer

3/2/2023: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/09/2023
  • Hearing06/09/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department T at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Fab4 LLC D/B/A Russell Westbrook Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram of Van Nuys Erroneously Sued As RUSSELL WESTBROOK CHRYSLER DODGE JEEP RAM (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: FCA US, LLC (Defendant); As to: Ghazaleh Hafizi (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Ghazaleh Hafizi (Plaintiff); As to: RUSSELL WESTBROOK CHRYSLER DODGE JEEP RAM (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 01/31/2023; Service Cost: 88.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Ghazaleh Hafizi (Plaintiff); As to: FCA US, LLC (Defendant); Service Date: 01/31/2023; Service Cost: 34.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Ghazaleh Hafizi (Plaintiff); As to: FCA US, LLC (Defendant); RUSSELL WESTBROOK CHRYSLER DODGE JEEP RAM (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Ghazaleh Hafizi (Plaintiff); As to: FCA US, LLC (Defendant); RUSSELL WESTBROOK CHRYSLER DODGE JEEP RAM (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Ghazaleh Hafizi (Plaintiff); As to: FCA US, LLC (Defendant); RUSSELL WESTBROOK CHRYSLER DODGE JEEP RAM (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 06/09/2023 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department T

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Shirley K. Watkins in Department T Van Nuys Courthouse East

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less