Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/15/2019 at 11:15:17 (UTC).

GHALI LAHLOU VS RICHARD SHUGARMAN ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/18/2017 GHALI LAHLOU filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against RICHARD SHUGARMAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LAURA A. SEIGLE. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0114

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LAURA A. SEIGLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

LAHLOU GHALI

Defendants and Respondents

SHUGARMAN RICHARD

DOES 1 TO 20

LANGE TANYA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

MCMAHON JOHN M. ESQ.

MCMAHON JOHN MICHAEL ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

GATES PETER JOHN ESQ.

 

Court Documents

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

12/21/2017: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF NAME CHANGE

9/11/2018: NOTICE OF NAME CHANGE

Unknown

4/3/2019: Unknown

Minute Order

4/3/2019: Minute Order

Request for Dismissal

4/10/2019: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Ruling

4/11/2019: Notice of Ruling

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

11/27/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

12/1/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

CoverSheet

10/18/2017: CoverSheet

Summons

10/18/2017: Summons

Complaint

10/18/2017: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Ghali Lahlou (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Ghali Lahlou (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Final Status Conference) of 04/03/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • Notice of Settlement; Filed by Ghali Lahlou (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • NOTICE OF NAME CHANGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • Notice of Change of Firm Name; Filed by Richard Shugarman (Defendant); Tanya Lange (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • Answer; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Ghali Lahlou (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Ghali Lahlou (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Ghali Lahlou (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • Summons; Filed by Ghali Lahlou (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCMAHON JOHN MICHAEL