This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/15/2021 at 01:40:09 (UTC).

GFS GLOBAL FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS EUROCODE TUNING, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 08/13/2020 GFS GLOBAL FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed an Other lawsuit against EUROCODE TUNING, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0571

  • Filing Date:

    08/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GFS GLOBAL FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendant

EUROCODE TUNING INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GREEN G RICHARD

 

Court Documents

Complaint

8/13/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/13/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/13/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/13/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/17/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

8/17/2020: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Request for Dismissal

11/25/2020: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department B; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department B; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by GFS Global Financial Services, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department B; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by GFS Global Financial Services, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by GFS Global Financial Services, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by GFS Global Financial Services, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less