This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/07/2023 at 22:29:57 (UTC).

GEVORG HAKOBYAN VS SABEH ABDAYEM, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/25/2022 GEVORG HAKOBYAN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SABEH ABDAYEM,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0971

  • Filing Date:

    10/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HAKOBYAN GEVORG

Cross Defendants, Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

ABDAYEM SABEH

ANTEKELIAN MANOUEL

VERDUZCO DOMINICK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BOYAZHYAN VARDAN

Defendant Attorney

ENG LESLIE JAMES

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

ASLANIAN ARPIE

Cross Defendant Attorney

RUGH CAROL

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement

3/6/2023: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

3/6/2023: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

3/2/2023: Case Management Statement

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR NOTICE OF REJECTION OF ELECTRONIC FILING

2/23/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR NOTICE OF REJECTION OF ELECTRONIC FILING

Notice of Related Case

2/21/2023: Notice of Related Case

Answer

2/14/2023: Answer

Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT

2/10/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT

Demand for Jury Trial

1/27/2023: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

1/27/2023: Answer

Cross-Complaint

1/27/2023: Cross-Complaint

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

1/27/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT

12/6/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT

Answer

12/6/2022: Answer

Answer

12/1/2022: Answer

Cross-Complaint

12/1/2022: Cross-Complaint

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - NOTICE OF POSTING OF JURY FEES / DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

12/1/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - NOTICE OF POSTING OF JURY FEES / DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

Answer

11/18/2022: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

11/18/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2023
  • Hearing03/21/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department F51 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Sabeh Abdayem (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Dominick Verduzco (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Manouel Antekelian (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Related Case: Filed By: Sabeh Abdayem (Defendant); Result: Rejected ; Result Date: 02/23/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by: Sabeh Abdayem (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Sabeh Abdayem (Cross-Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • DocketSummons on Cross Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Manouel Antekelian (Cross-Complainant); As to: Dominick Verduzco (Cross-Defendant); Sabeh Abdayem (Cross-Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Manouel Antekelian (Defendant); As to: Gevorg Hakobyan (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Gevorg Hakobyan (Plaintiff); As to: Sabeh Abdayem (Defendant); Service Cost: 75.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Gevorg Hakobyan (Plaintiff); As to: Manouel Antekelian (Defendant); Service Cost: 75.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Gevorg Hakobyan (Plaintiff); As to: Dominick Verduzco (Defendant); Service Cost: 75.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 03/21/2023 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F51

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Gevorg Hakobyan (Plaintiff); As to: Sabeh Abdayem (Defendant); Manouel Antekelian (Defendant); Dominick Verduzco (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Gevorg Hakobyan (Plaintiff); As to: Sabeh Abdayem (Defendant); Manouel Antekelian (Defendant); Dominick Verduzco (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Gevorg Hakobyan (Plaintiff); As to: Sabeh Abdayem (Defendant); Manouel Antekelian (Defendant); Dominick Verduzco (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Randy Rhodes in Department F51 Chatsworth Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less