This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/20/2019 at 00:51:10 (UTC).

GERSZT, LIAT VS GERSZT, TREVOR

Case Summary

On 05/07/2018 GERSZT, LIAT filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against GERSZT, TREVOR. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5657

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GERSZT LIAT

Respondent

GERSZT TREVOR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

HEKMAT RAYMOND

Respondent Attorney

LAX MATTHEW EDWARD

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2018
  • Notice - Entry of Dismissal; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • Request - Dismissal; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • Request - Dismissal (Rejected ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • Proof of Service - Mail (on 05/31/18 re: response to dissolution & uccjea ); Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • Declaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation; Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • Notice - Acknowledgment of Receipt of Summons & Petition; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • Declaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less