This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/13/2023 at 10:27:08 (UTC).

GERONIMO S. ROMAN VS BEST CONTRACTING SERVICES, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/30/2022 GERONIMO S ROMAN filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against BEST CONTRACTING SERVICES, INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is AUDRA MORI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8253

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

AUDRA MORI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROMAN GERONIMO S.

Cross Plaintiffs and Defendants

BEST CONTRACTING SERVICES INC.

SWINERTON BUILDERS

Cross Defendant

CONCRETE COLLABORATIVE LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BLOOM MARK J.

Defendant Attorney

LAWLESS KEVIN EARL

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT

1/20/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT

Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT

1/20/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT

Answer

1/17/2023: Answer

Answer

1/17/2023: Answer

Cross-Complaint

1/17/2023: Cross-Complaint

Cross-Complaint

1/17/2023: Cross-Complaint

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/19/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

12/19/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE)

11/3/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE)]

11/3/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE)]

Notice of Related Case

9/28/2022: Notice of Related Case

Complaint

8/30/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/30/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/30/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

8/30/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

8/30/2022: Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

8/30/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

8/30/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2024
  • Hearing08/27/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2024
  • Hearing02/27/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2024
  • Hearing02/13/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketSummons on Cross Complaint; Issued and Filed by: BEST CONTRACTING SERVICES, INC. (Cross-Complainant); As to: Concrete Collaborative, LLC (Cross-Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketSummons on Cross Complaint; Issued and Filed by: SWINERTON BUILDERS (Cross-Complainant); As to: Concrete Collaborative, LLC (Cross-Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: BEST CONTRACTING SERVICES, INC. (Defendant); As to: GERONIMO S. ROMAN (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by: BEST CONTRACTING SERVICES, INC. (Defendant); As to: Concrete Collaborative, LLC (Cross-Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: SWINERTON BUILDERS (Defendant); As to: GERONIMO S. ROMAN (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by: SWINERTON BUILDERS (Defendant); As to: Concrete Collaborative, LLC (Cross-Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Proof of Service by Substituted Service: Document changed from Proof of Personal Service to Proof of Service by Substituted Service ; As To Parties changed from BEST CONTRACTING SERVICES, INC. (Defendant) to BEST CONTRACTING SERVICES, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. William A. Crowfoot in Department 27 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 02/13/2024 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/27/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: GERONIMO S. ROMAN (Plaintiff); As to: BEST CONTRACTING SERVICES, INC. (Defendant); SWINERTON BUILDERS (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: GERONIMO S. ROMAN (Plaintiff); As to: BEST CONTRACTING SERVICES, INC. (Defendant); SWINERTON BUILDERS (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: GERONIMO S. ROMAN (Plaintiff); As to: BEST CONTRACTING SERVICES, INC. (Defendant); SWINERTON BUILDERS (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketSeventh Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less