This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/06/2021 at 02:21:34 (UTC).

GERMAN ARRIOLA MEJIA VS DTI ASSOCIATES, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/29/2020 GERMAN ARRIOLA MEJIA filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against DTI ASSOCIATES, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM F. FAHEY. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4532

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM F. FAHEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ARRIOLA MEJIA GERMAN

Defendants

CROSS DOE 1 DEBRAH

RICHARDSON BRETT

BULK TRANSPORTATION

DTI ASSOCIATES LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BAUMLER NINA JANE

BYRNE ADRIAN

Defendant Attorneys

FERRUZZO GREGORY JOSEPH

RUMM JAMES

HARRIS JILLIAN

 

Court Documents

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR AMENDED ORDER ON APPROVED COMPROMISE AND SETTLEMENT OF PRIVATE ATTORNEYS GENERAL ACT OF 2004 ("PAGA") CAUSE OF ACTION

6/24/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR AMENDED ORDER ON APPROVED COMPROMISE AND SETTLEMENT OF PRIVATE ATTORNEYS GENERAL ACT OF 2004 ("PAGA") CAUSE OF ACTION

Order - ORDER PROPOSED ORDER ON AMENDED JOINT STIPULATION FOR APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT OF PAGA CAUSE OF ACTION

7/20/2021: Order - ORDER PROPOSED ORDER ON AMENDED JOINT STIPULATION FOR APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT OF PAGA CAUSE OF ACTION

Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER

7/27/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

7/30/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Request for Dismissal

7/30/2021: Request for Dismissal

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

6/24/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Notice - NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF PAGA SETTLEMENT

6/8/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF PAGA SETTLEMENT

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF COURT ORDER

6/21/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF COURT ORDER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER FOR APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT OF PRIVA...)

6/21/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER FOR APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT OF PRIVA...)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

6/21/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Order - ORDER [PROPOSED] ORDER FOR APPROVAL OF REPRESENTATIVE SETTLEMENT OF PRIVATE ATTORNEYS GENERAL ACT 2004 (PAGA) CAUSE OF ACTION

6/21/2021: Order - ORDER [PROPOSED] ORDER FOR APPROVAL OF REPRESENTATIVE SETTLEMENT OF PRIVATE ATTORNEYS GENERAL ACT 2004 (PAGA) CAUSE OF ACTION

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

4/12/2021: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

4/12/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Notice of Settlement

4/12/2021: Notice of Settlement

Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING CONFIDENTIAL INDIVIDUAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

5/21/2021: Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING CONFIDENTIAL INDIVIDUAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

Motion for Order - MOTION FOR ORDER APPROVING REPRESENTATIVE SETTLEMENT OF PRIVATE ATTORNEYS GENERAL ACT 2004 (PAGA) CAUSE OF ACTION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

5/21/2021: Motion for Order - MOTION FOR ORDER APPROVING REPRESENTATIVE SETTLEMENT OF PRIVATE ATTORNEYS GENERAL ACT 2004 (PAGA) CAUSE OF ACTION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

5/21/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF NINA BAUMLER IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF REPRESENTATIVE SETTLEMENT OF PRIVATE ATTORNEYS GENERAL ACT OF 2004 (PAGA) CAUSE OF ACTION

5/21/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF NINA BAUMLER IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF REPRESENTATIVE SETTLEMENT OF PRIVATE ATTORNEYS GENERAL ACT OF 2004 (PAGA) CAUSE OF ACTION

60 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by GERMAN ARRIOLA MEJIA (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by GERMAN ARRIOLA MEJIA (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Court Order); Filed by GERMAN ARRIOLA MEJIA (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketOrder (Proposed Order on Amended Joint Stipulation for Approval of Settlement of PAGA Cause of Action); Filed by GERMAN ARRIOLA MEJIA (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (for Amended Order on Approved Compromise and Settlement of Private Attorneys General Act of 2004 ("PAGA") Cause of Action); Filed by GERMAN ARRIOLA MEJIA (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by GERMAN ARRIOLA MEJIA (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 16; Hearing on Motion - Other (for Approval of Settlement of Private Attorneys General Act of 2004 ("PAGA") Cause of Action; Filed by Plaintiff German Arriola Mejia;) - Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 16; Hearing on Motion for Leave (to File Amended Complaint) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketOrder ([PROPOSED] ORDER FOR APPROVAL OF REPRESENTATIVE SETTLEMENT OF PRIVATE ATTORNEYS GENERAL ACT 2004 (?PAGA?) CAUSE OF ACTION); Filed by GERMAN ARRIOLA MEJIA (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by GERMAN ARRIOLA MEJIA (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
60 More Docket Entries
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by GERMAN ARRIOLA MEJIA (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by GERMAN ARRIOLA MEJIA (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • Docketat 3:30 PM in Department 69, William F. Fahey, Presiding; Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Plaintiff's Peremptory Challenge filed Against...) of 07/08/2020); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re Plaintiff's Peremptory Challenge filed Against...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by GERMAN ARRIOLA MEJIA (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by GERMAN ARRIOLA MEJIA (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by GERMAN ARRIOLA MEJIA (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by GERMAN ARRIOLA MEJIA (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DTI ASSOCIATES LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where BULK TRANSPORTATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FERRUZZO GREGORY JOSEPH

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RUMM JAMES