This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/12/2019 at 00:55:43 (UTC).

GERARDO VIRREY VS. ELIBORIO VIRREY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/24/2018 a Property - Other Real Property case was filed by GERARDO VIRREY against ELIBORIO VIRREY in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9164

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Compton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

MAURICE A. LEITER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VIRRERY GERARDO

Defendants

VIRREY ELIBORIO

DOES 1-25

ALL PERSONS UNKNONW CLAIMING ANY LEGAL

VIRREY MARGARITA GUADALUPE

Other

LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT

 

Court Documents

Summons

5/24/2018: Summons

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/24/2018: Notice of Case Management Conference

Complaint

5/24/2018: Complaint

Legacy Document

6/26/2018: Legacy Document

Legacy Document

6/26/2018: Legacy Document

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

7/25/2018: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

7/25/2018: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Notice of Motion

8/27/2018: Notice of Motion

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

9/14/2018: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Declaration

9/14/2018: Declaration

Legacy Document

9/14/2018: Legacy Document

Minute Order

9/20/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

9/20/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

2/13/2019: Minute Order

Minute Order

4/3/2019: Minute Order

Case Management Statement

4/26/2019: Case Management Statement

Declaration

5/1/2019: Declaration

Notice of Ruling

5/15/2019: Notice of Ruling

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/15/2019
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by GERARDO VIRRERY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A, Maurice A. Leiter, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Dismissal or Failure to Prosecute) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A, Maurice A. Leiter, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A, Maurice A. Leiter, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Trial Setting Conference; Order t...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • Declaration (In Response To Gilbert M. Gutierrez Response to Order to Show Cause); Filed by Eliborio Virrey (Defendant); Margarita Guadalupe Virrey (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by Eliborio Virrey (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • Declaration (Response to Order to Show Cause re Dismissal); Filed by GERARDO VIRRERY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A, Maurice A. Leiter, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A, Maurice A. Leiter, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Dismissal or Failure to Prosecute) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 07/05/2018
  • Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by Margarita Guadalupe Virrey (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • Request-Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • Request to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by GERARDO VIRRERY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Notice of Lis Pendens; Filed by GERARDO VIRRERY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by GERARDO VIRRERY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • Summons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by GERARDO VIRRERY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by GERARDO VIRRERY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: TC029164    Hearing Date: March 10, 2020    Dept: A

# 8. Maria Rocha v. Tony’s MHS, Inc., et al.

Case No.: TC029156

Matter on calendar for: Motion for Summary Judgment

Tentative ruling:

  1. Background

    Plaintiff Maria Rocha allegedly hired defendants Tony’s MHS, Inc., and Ronald Zablan, erroneously sued as Ronald Nabuau, to work on her mobile home. Although Rocha paid the defendants, they did not perform their alleged obligations under the contract. Zablan is self-represented.

    Plaintiff now moves for summary judgment. Plaintiff filed and served her motion for summary judgment on October 22, 2019. Motions for summary judgment must be filed and served 75 calendar days before the hearing. (C.C.P., § 437c(2).) This is a jurisdictional requirement that cannot be cured by a continuance. Plaintiff’s subsequent proofs of service showing the motion was re-served and that the hearing was continued do not suffice; Plaintiff must reserve the motion with a new original hearing date.

    The motion for summary judgment is taken off-calendar.

  2. Ruling

    The motion for summary judgment is taken off-calendar. Plaintiff must reserve the motion with a new original hearing date.

    Next dates:

    Notice: