This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/01/2021 at 07:15:01 (UTC).

GERARDO SANCHEZ, ET AL. VS GENERAL MOTORS LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 GERARDO SANCHEZ filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GENERAL MOTORS LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0378

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SANCHEZ CARINA

SANCHEZ GERARDO

Defendants

THREE-WAY CHEVROLET CO. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA THREE WAY CHEVROLET CADILLAC

GENERAL MOTORS LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MIKHOV STEVE

Defendant Attorney

FLORES MARLENE KRISTEN

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

4/29/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF AMY MORSE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES FROM DEFENDANT, AND REQUEST

2/26/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF AMY MORSE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES FROM DEFENDANT, AND REQUEST

Motion re: - NOTICE OF MOTION AND PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES FROM DEFENDANT, AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS FIRST SET OF REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

2/26/2021: Motion re: - NOTICE OF MOTION AND PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES FROM DEFENDANT, AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS FIRST SET OF REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

3/26/2021: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Separate Statement

3/26/2021: Separate Statement

Declaration - DECLARATION OF LAURENCE BRADDELL IN SUPPORT OF GENERAL MOTORS LLC'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES

3/26/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF LAURENCE BRADDELL IN SUPPORT OF GENERAL MOTORS LLC'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES

Separate Statement

4/2/2021: Separate Statement

Opposition - OPPOSITION GENERAL MOTORS LLCS MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES FROM DEFENDANT, AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS

4/2/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION GENERAL MOTORS LLCS MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES FROM DEFENDANT, AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS

Notice of Settlement

4/13/2021: Notice of Settlement

Reply - REPLY [PLAINTIFFS] TO DEFENDANT GENERAL MOTORS LLCS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL THE DEPOSITION OF GENERAL MOTORS LLCS PERSON MOST KNOWLEDGEABLE AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS

12/23/2020: Reply - REPLY [PLAINTIFFS] TO DEFENDANT GENERAL MOTORS LLCS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL THE DEPOSITION OF GENERAL MOTORS LLCS PERSON MOST KNOWLEDGEABLE AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE (ALL-PURPOSE; POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERE...)

10/30/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE (ALL-PURPOSE; POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERE...)

Motion re: - MOTION RE: TO COMPEL DEPOSITION ATTENDANCE OF DEFENDANT GENERAL MOTORS LLCS PERSON MOST KNOWLEDGEABLE AND CUSTODIAN OF RECORDS AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS; MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT

11/2/2020: Motion re: - MOTION RE: TO COMPEL DEPOSITION ATTENDANCE OF DEFENDANT GENERAL MOTORS LLCS PERSON MOST KNOWLEDGEABLE AND CUSTODIAN OF RECORDS AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS; MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT

Case Management Statement

6/26/2020: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

7/6/2020: Case Management Statement

Answer

2/7/2020: Answer

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/13/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/6/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/6/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 58; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 58; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketNotice (OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL); Filed by GERARDO SANCHEZ (Plaintiff); CARINA SANCHEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 58; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 58; Status Conference ((All-Purpose; OSC Re "Stipulation and (Proposed) Order ReWaiver of Disqualification")) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference (All-Purpose; OSC Re "Stipulation and (Prop...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 58; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by GERARDO SANCHEZ (Plaintiff); CARINA SANCHEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketReply (PLAINTIFFS? REPLY TO DEFENDANT?S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS? MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES FROM DEFENDANT AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS ? REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS); Filed by GERARDO SANCHEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
46 More Docket Entries
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Marlene Kristen Flores (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by THREE-WAY CHEVROLET CO., a California Corporation dba THREE WAY CHEVROLET CADILLAC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by GENERAL MOTORS LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by GERARDO SANCHEZ (Plaintiff); CARINA SANCHEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by GERARDO SANCHEZ (Plaintiff); CARINA SANCHEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by GERARDO SANCHEZ (Plaintiff); CARINA SANCHEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THREE WAY CHEVROLET CO., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where General Motors, LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FLORES MARLENE KRISTEN