This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/03/2019 at 01:49:23 (UTC).

GERARDO LOZANO VS ULS EXPRESS INC.

Case Summary

On 04/28/2017 GERARDO LOZANO filed a Labor - Wage Claim lawsuit against ULS EXPRESS INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ROSS KLEIN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3728

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wage Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ROSS KLEIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GERARDO LOZANO

LOZANO GERARDO

Defendants

ULS EXPRESS INC.

HOLLAND & KNIGHT ALLDERDICE

Other

DAVID L. GURLEY ESQ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GOMEZ LAW GROUP

Defendant Attorney

HOLLAND & KNIGHT (ALLDERDICE )

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2017
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by ESQ DAVID L. GURLEY (Legacy Party); GERARDO LOZANO (Plaintiff); HOLLAND & KNIGHT (ALLDERDICE ) (Legacy Party) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department S26; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Matter continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by GERARDO LOZANO (Plaintiff); HOLLAND & KNIGHT (ALLDERDICE ) (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by HOLLAND & KNIGHT (ALLDERDICE ) (Legacy Party); ULS EXPRESS INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • Miscellaneous-Other; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department S26; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service (OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv.; OSC Discharged) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by HOLLAND & KNIGHT (ALLDERDICE ) (Legacy Party); ULS EXPRESS INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 309; (Order ReRelated Cases; Court makes order) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2017
  • Notice; Filed by HOLLAND & KNIGHT (ALLDERDICE ) (Legacy Party); ULS EXPRESS INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by ESQ DAVID L. GURLEY (Legacy Party); GERARDO LOZANO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • Notice; Filed by Labor Commissioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • Notice; Filed by ESQ DAVID L. GURLEY (Legacy Party); GERARDO LOZANO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by GERARDO LOZANO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by GERARDO LOZANO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • at 11:00 AM in Department S27; (Affidavit of Prejudice; Transferred to Diff. Department) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by HOLLAND & KNIGHT (ALLDERDICE ) (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by GERARDO LOZANO (Plaintiff); HOLLAND & KNIGHT (ALLDERDICE ) (Legacy Party); ULS EXPRESS INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • Notice; Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • Undertaking; Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ULS EXPRESS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where HOLLAND & KNIGHT LLP is a litigant