This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/15/2019 at 10:12:41 (UTC).

GERARDO HERNANDEZ VS VALENZUELA TRANSPORTATION ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/18/2017 GERARDO HERNANDEZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against VALENZUELA TRANSPORTATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MARGARET MILLER BERNAL and YOLANDA OROZCO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7338

  • Filing Date:

    12/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MARGARET MILLER BERNAL

YOLANDA OROZCO

 

Party Details

Petitioners, Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

HERNANDEZ GERARDO

VALENZUELA TRANSPORTATION

CONRADO MONTENEGRO JR.

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

PAVESTONE CORPORATION

MONTENEGRO CONRADO JR.

HOME DEPORT U.S.A.

VALENZUELA TRANSPORTATION

DOES 1 THROUGH 50

QUIKRETE INTERNATIONAL INC.DOE

QUIKRETE INTERNATIONAL INC.

QUIKRETE INTERNATIONAL INC. [DOE 1]

CONRADO MONTENEGRO JR.

U.S.A. HOME DEPOT

Respondents, Defendants and Cross Defendants

MONTENEGRO CONRADO JR.

HOME DEPORT U.S.A.

VALENZUELA TRANSPORTATION

DOES 1 THROUGH 50

12 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

PAKIZ J. DEREK ESQ.

THOMPSON MARC B. ESQ

THOMPSON MARC B ESQ

J. DEREK PAKIZ ESQ

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

MORGENSTERN ROBERT A. ESQ

GIOVACCHINI GINA N.

KORNOFF ANDREW F.

VASQUEZ DAVIL ROBERT

JACOBSEN KAREN LEE

DUMITRESCU SILVIANA DANA

 

Court Documents

Substitution of Attorney

7/10/2019: Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney

7/12/2019: Substitution of Attorney

Motion for Summary Judgment

8/9/2019: Motion for Summary Judgment

Separate Statement

8/9/2019: Separate Statement

Declaration

8/9/2019: Declaration

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

2/6/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Legacy Document

4/16/2018: Legacy Document

Answer

4/20/2018: Answer

Minute Order

5/14/2018: Minute Order

Order

5/23/2018: Order

Minute Order

5/30/2018: Minute Order

Legacy Document

6/6/2018: Legacy Document

Legacy Document

6/7/2018: Legacy Document

Request for Dismissal

6/15/2018: Request for Dismissal

Case Management Statement

6/20/2018: Case Management Statement

Legacy Document

6/21/2018: Legacy Document

Case Management Statement

6/21/2018: Case Management Statement

Notice of Ruling

6/22/2018: Notice of Ruling

93 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2020
  • Hearingat 09:30 AM in Department F at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department F at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department F at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • Hearingat 13:30 PM in Department C at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (Lofton Decl and Exhibits ISO MSJ); Filed by QUIKRETE INTERNATIONAL, INC. (Defendant); QUIKRETE INTERNATIONAL, INC.(DOE 1,11,31) (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • DocketMotion for Summary Judgment; Filed by QUIKRETE INTERNATIONAL, INC. (Defendant); QUIKRETE INTERNATIONAL, INC.(DOE 1,11,31) (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • DocketSeparate Statement (of Undisputed Material Facts in Support of Defendants, Pavestone, LLC and Quikrete International, Inc.'s, Motion for Summary Judgment, Or In The Alternatie, Summary Adjudication); Filed by QUIKRETE INTERNATIONAL, INC. (Defendant); QUIKRETE INTERNATIONAL, INC.(DOE 1,11,31) (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department C; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by JR. CONRADO MONTENEGRO (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by VALENZUELA TRANSPORTATION (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
213 More Docket Entries
  • 01/30/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • DocketReceipt; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • DocketCIVIL DEPOSIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: 1. NEGLIGENCE; ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Gerardo Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Gerardo Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****7338    Hearing Date: January 16, 2020    Dept: SEC

HERNANDEZ v. VALENZUELA TRANSPORTATION

CASE NO.:  ****7338

HEARING:  01/16/2020

JUDGE: OLIVIA ROSALES

#6

TENTATIVE ORDER

Defendants PAVESTONE, LLC and QUIKRETE INTERNATIONAL, INC.’s Motion for Summary Judgment, or in the alternative, Summary Adjudication is CONTINUED to Thursday, April 2, 2020 at 1:30 p.m. in Dept. SE-C to be heard in conjunction with Plaintiff’s Motion for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint set for that same date.

Opposing Party to give Notice.

Plaintiff’s Motion for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint is scheduled for hearing on April 2, 2020. If Plaintiff’s Motion is granted, the Second Amended Complaint will supersede Plaintiff’s First Amended Complaint and Defendants’ Motion for Summary Judgment/Adjudication will be rendered moot. In the interests of judicial efficiency, Defendants’ Motion is CONTINUED to be heard on the same date as Plaintiff’s Motion for Leave to Amend.



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where dba Pavestone is a litigant

Latest cases where QUIKRETE INTERNATIONAL INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DUMITRESCU SILVIANA DANA