This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/08/2020 at 04:16:50 (UTC).

GERARDO HERNANDEZ VS CHRISTIAN CURZ LAZO ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/02/2018 GERARDO HERNANDEZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CHRISTIAN CURZ LAZO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are GEORGINA T. RIZK, KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE and MARK A. BORENSTEIN. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4691

  • Filing Date:

    05/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

GEORGINA T. RIZK

KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE

MARK A. BORENSTEIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

HERNANDEZ GERARDO

Defendants, Respondents and Cross Plaintiffs

LAZO CHRISTIAN CRUZ

LAZO RAYMOND MICHAEL

DOES 1 TO 50

Cross Defendant

ROES 1 THROUGH 100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

SOOFER RAMIN ESQ.

MESSERLIAN VAHE K

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

SPRIGGS SCOTT B. ESQ.

SPRIGGS SCOTT BRIAN ESQ.

BILAS JEFFREY DONALD ESQ.

SPRIGGS SCOTT BRIAN

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

SPRIGGS SCOTT BRIAN

 

Court Documents

Order - COURT ORDER RE: TRANSFER OF COMPLICATED PERSONAL INJURY CASE TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT

11/5/2019: Order - COURT ORDER RE: TRANSFER OF COMPLICATED PERSONAL INJURY CASE TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS; CASE MANAGEMENT ...)

1/22/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS; CASE MANAGEMENT ...)

Declaration - DECLARATION PLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS

1/15/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION PLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

1/9/2020: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Declaration - DECLARATION OF MICHAEL F. MOON IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO PLAITNIFF'S MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS

1/9/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF MICHAEL F. MOON IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO PLAITNIFF'S MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION DEFENDANT'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ADVANCE HEARING DATE OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM WAIVER

1/6/2020: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION DEFENDANT'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ADVANCE HEARING DATE OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM WAIVER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ADVANCE HEARING DATE OF DE...)

1/3/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ADVANCE HEARING DATE OF DE...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: TRANSFER AND REASSIGNMENT OF COMPLICATED PERS...) OF 11/05/2019

11/5/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: TRANSFER AND REASSIGNMENT OF COMPLICATED PERS...) OF 11/05/2019

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: TRANSFER AND REASSIGNMENT OF COMPLICATED PERS...)

11/5/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: TRANSFER AND REASSIGNMENT OF COMPLICATED PERS...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM ...)

11/13/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM ...)

Opposition - OPPOSITION NOTICE OF REPLY AND REPLY TO UNTIMELY OPPOSIITON TO MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS - HERNANDEZ V LAZO

11/1/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION NOTICE OF REPLY AND REPLY TO UNTIMELY OPPOSIITON TO MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS - HERNANDEZ V LAZO

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF'S DEPOSITION; REQUEST F...) OF 10/15/2019

10/15/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF'S DEPOSITION; REQUEST F...) OF 10/15/2019

Motion re: - MOTION RE: DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM WAIVER

10/16/2019: Motion re: - MOTION RE: DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM WAIVER

Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF

10/1/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS, TO S...)

9/27/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS, TO S...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANC...) OF 09/03/2019

9/3/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANC...) OF 09/03/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

5/31/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

57 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/02/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Christian Cruz Lazo (Cross-Complainant); Raymond Michael Lazo (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 19; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • Docketat 3:30 PM in Department 19; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 03/16/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 19; Hearing on Motion - Other (Defendant's Motion for Relief from Waiver) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 19; Hearing on Motion for Terminating Sanctions - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 2, Mark A. Borenstein, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • Docketat 10:57 AM in Department 19; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 2, Mark A. Borenstein, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
86 More Docket Entries
  • 07/09/2018
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Christian Cruz Lazo (Defendant); Raymond Michael Lazo (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Christian Cruz Lazo (Defendant); Raymond Michael Lazo (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • DocketCross-Complaint (for Total and/or Partial Indemnity); Filed by Christian Cruz Lazo (Cross-Complainant); Raymond Michael Lazo (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Gerardo Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Gerardo Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: (1) NEGLIGENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Gerardo Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC704691    Hearing Date: November 08, 2019    Dept: 2

AFTER REVIEW OF THE COURT FILE, THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING ORDER:

Department 2 of the Personal Injury Court has determined that the above-entitled action is complicated based upon the number of pretrial hearings and/or the complexity of the issues presented.

AT THE DIRECTION OF DEPARTMENT 1:

This case is hereby transferred and reassigned to the following Independent Calendar Court in the CENTRAL DISTRICT, LOS ANGELES, JUDGE STEPHANIE BOWICK presiding in Department 19 for all purposes except trial. Department 1 hereby delegates to the Independent Calendar Court the authority to assign the cause for trial to that Independent Calendar Court.

The Order is signed and filed this date, and incorporated herein by reference. Any pending motions or hearings, including trial and status conferences, will be reset, continued or vacated at the direction of the newly assigned Independent Calendar court.

Upon receipt of this notice, counsel for Plaintiff shall give notice to all parties of record.