This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/26/2019 at 10:30:41 (UTC).

GERARD CERNA VS WHOLESALE INVESTMENTS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/22/2019 GERARD CERNA filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against WHOLESALE INVESTMENTS, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICHARD E. RICO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6237

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RICHARD E. RICO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CERNA GERARD

Defendants

BMW OF NORTH AMERICA LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY CORPORATION

CAPITAL ONE NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

WHOLESALE INVESTMENTS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KLITZKE MICHAEL A.

Defendant Attorneys

RAMSAY BLAKE H.

ELEY HUNTER RANDOLPH

NYS MARK HUBERT

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Mail

5/31/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

5/16/2019: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Case Management Statement

5/9/2019: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

5/2/2019: Case Management Statement

Substitution of Attorney

5/1/2019: Substitution of Attorney

Proof of Service by Mail

3/25/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

3/20/2019: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/20/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

3/22/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

3/22/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/22/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

3/15/2019: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

3/5/2019: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

3/6/2019: Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

Summons - Summons on Complaint

2/22/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

2/22/2019: Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

Complaint

2/22/2019: Complaint

Affidavit - Affidavit Affidavit of Venue

2/22/2019: Affidavit - Affidavit Affidavit of Venue

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2020
  • Hearing03/02/2020 at 09:00 AM in Department 58 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • Hearing02/25/2020 at 09:00 AM in Department 58 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • Hearing12/04/2019 at 08:30 AM in Department 58 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 58; Status Conference ((All-Purpose)) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference (All-Purpose))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 58; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 58; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Gerard Cerna (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 58; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 03/06/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 17, Richard E. Rico, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Gerard Cerna (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Gerard Cerna (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Gerard Cerna (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Gerard Cerna (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • DocketStatement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death); Filed by Gerard Cerna (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • DocketAffidavit (Affidavit of Venue); Filed by Gerard Cerna (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WHOLESALE INVESTMENTS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where CAPITAL ONE N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases where BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KLITZKE MICHAEL A.