This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/18/2021 at 13:35:30 (UTC).

GERARADO BENITEZ VS CALIFORNIA COMBINING CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 06/29/2020 GERARADO BENITEZ filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against CALIFORNIA COMBINING CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MAREN NELSON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4786

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MAREN NELSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BENITEZ GERARADO

Defendant

CALIFORNIA COMBINING CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MAHONEY KEVIN

TUNYAN LILIT G.

SWIFT MICHAEL ANDRE

SINGER GEORGE BERNARD

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: SUBMISSION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT)

6/7/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: SUBMISSION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: SUBMISSION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT) OF 06/07/2021

6/7/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: SUBMISSION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT) OF 06/07/2021

Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF PRIVATE ATTORNEYS GENERAL ACT OF 2004 CLAIMS WITHOUT PREJUDICE SO THAT ONLY HIS INDIVIDUAL CLAIMS REMAIN IN THIS ACTION

12/8/2020: Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF PRIVATE ATTORNEYS GENERAL ACT OF 2004 CLAIMS WITHOUT PREJUDICE SO THAT ONLY HIS INDIVIDUAL CLAIMS REMAIN IN THIS ACTION

Order - ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF PRIVATE ATTORNEYS GENERAL ACT OR 2004 CLAIMS WITHOUT PREJUDICE SO THAT ONLY HIS INDIVIDUAL CLAIMS REMAIN IN THIS ACTION

12/16/2020: Order - ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF PRIVATE ATTORNEYS GENERAL ACT OR 2004 CLAIMS WITHOUT PREJUDICE SO THAT ONLY HIS INDIVIDUAL CLAIMS REMAIN IN THIS ACTION

Notice - PLAINTIFF GERARDO BENITEZ'S NOTICE OF INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE

1/8/2021: Notice - PLAINTIFF GERARDO BENITEZ'S NOTICE OF INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1/15/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE, AS TO DOES 1 THROUGH 50

1/15/2021: Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE, AS TO DOES 1 THROUGH 50

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

1/25/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1/27/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Status Conference Statement - INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT

3/3/2021: Status Conference Statement - INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT

Status Conference Statement - INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT

3/3/2021: Status Conference Statement - INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE; TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

3/10/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE; TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Notice - NOTICE OF ORDERS AFTER HEARING

3/11/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF ORDERS AFTER HEARING

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 585 CCP IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT OF GEORGE B. SINGER

4/23/2021: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 585 CCP IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT OF GEORGE B. SINGER

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 585 CCP IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT OF GERARDO BENITEZ

4/23/2021: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 585 CCP IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT OF GERARDO BENITEZ

Declaration re: Due Diligence

4/23/2021: Declaration re: Due Diligence

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (DEFAULT PROVE UP HEARING)

5/17/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (DEFAULT PROVE UP HEARING)

Brief - PLAINTIFF'S BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF DAMAGES SOUGHT IN REQUEST FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

6/2/2021: Brief - PLAINTIFF'S BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF DAMAGES SOUGHT IN REQUEST FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2021
  • Hearing07/19/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 17 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 17, Maren Nelson, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review (ReSubmission of Default Judgment) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Submission of Default Judgment)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Submission of Default Judgment) of 06/07/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketPlaintiff's Brief in Support of Damages Sought in request for Default Judgment; Filed by Gerarado Benitez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 17, Maren Nelson, Presiding; Default Prove Up Hearing - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Default Prove Up Hearing)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketDeclaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment (of George B. Singer); Filed by Gerarado Benitez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketDeclaration re: Due Diligence; Filed by Gerarado Benitez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketDeclaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment (of Gerardo Benitez); Filed by Gerarado Benitez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint for Damages; Filed by Gerarado Benitez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Gerarado Benitez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • Docketat 3:31 PM in Department 17, Maren Nelson, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Complex Designation) of 07/16/2020, Initial Status Conference Order); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re: Complex Designation)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketInitial Status Conference Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Gerarado Benitez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Gerarado Benitez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer TUNYAN, LILIT

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SWIFT MICHAEL ANDRE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SINGER GEORGE B.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MAHONEY KEVIN