This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/01/2021 at 11:29:59 (UTC).

GERALYN LAFLEUR VS STRATEGIC LEGAL PRACTICES, APC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/05/2021 GERALYN LAFLEUR filed a Contract - Professional Negligence lawsuit against STRATEGIC LEGAL PRACTICES, APC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MICHAEL L. STERN and MAUREEN DUFFY-LEWIS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4818

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MICHAEL L. STERN

MAUREEN DUFFY-LEWIS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LAFLEUR GERALYN

Defendants

STRATEGIC LEGAL PRACTICES APC

CUTLER JACOB W

SHAHIAN PAYAM

KNIGHT LAW GROUP LLP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TAYLOR THRIS VAN

Defendant Attorney

SOHAL VIKRAM

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2021
  • Hearing12/01/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 38 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Status of Arbitration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 38, Maureen Duffy-Lewis, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Sanctions (/ By Payan Shahiam (Defendant)) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Sanctions / By Payan Shahiam (Defendant))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketOrder Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore (Jina Kaye Soto, CSR# 7783); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketObjection (TO PLAINTIFF REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS); Filed by STRATEGIC LEGAL PRACTICES, APC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketObjection (to Plaintiff's Request for Sanctions); Filed by STRATEGIC LEGAL PRACTICES, APC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketNotice (Re: The Court's Granting of Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration); Filed by STRATEGIC LEGAL PRACTICES, APC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 38, Maureen Duffy-Lewis, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 38, Maureen Duffy-Lewis, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration (/By Strategic Lega Practices, (Defendant)) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 38, Maureen Duffy-Lewis, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel (PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL STAYING OF ARBITRATION PROCEEDINGS IN THE MATTER OF STRATEGIC LEGAL PRACTICES, APC., ET AL V. GERALYN LAFLEUR (By Plaintiff)) - Held - Motion Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketExhibit List; Filed by Geralyn LaFleur (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by STRATEGIC LEGAL PRACTICES, APC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketMotion to Compel Arbitration; Filed by STRATEGIC LEGAL PRACTICES, APC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketExhibit List; Filed by STRATEGIC LEGAL PRACTICES, APC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Geralyn LaFleur (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Geralyn LaFleur (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Geralyn LaFleur (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Geralyn LaFleur (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STRATEGIC LEGAL PRACTICES APC is a litigant

Latest cases where KNIGHT LAW GROUP LLP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TAYLOR THRIS VAN