Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/11/2020 at 07:48:40 (UTC).

GERALD ROST, ET AL. VS 3M COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/09/2019 GERALD ROST filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against 3M COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2127

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ROST GERALD

ROST PATRICIA

Defendants

3M COMPANY

PNEUMO-ABEX LLC FKA AMERICAN BRAKE SHOE COMPANY FKA AMERICAN BRAKE SHOE AND FOUNDRY COMPANY INCLUDING THE AMERICAN BRAKEBLOC DIVISION FKA THE AMERICAN BRAKE MATERIALS CORPORATION

KAISER GYPSUM COMPANY INC.

JONES AND JONES CONSTRUCTION

METALCLAD INSULATION LLC FKA METALCLAD INSULATION CORPORATION

GENERAL GROWTH PROPERTIES INC.

E. F. BRADY COMPANY INC.

AMCORD INC.

DANA COMPANIES LLC FKA DANA CORPORATION

HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC.

WF HAYWARD COMPANY

BRIGGS AND STRATTON

HINNEWINKEL CONSTRUCTION INC.

SOCO WEST INC. FKA BRENNTAG WEST INC. FKA SOCO-LYNCH CORPORATION FKA SOCO-WESTERN CHEMICAL CORPORATION FKA STINNES-WESTERN CHEMICAL CORPORATION

CERTAINTEED CORPORATION

KELLY-MOORE PAINT COMPANY INC.

PAREX USA INC. FKA PAREXLAHABRA INC. FKA LA HABRA PRODUCTS INC.

HENNESSY INDUSTRIES INC.

17 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DEBLASE PATRICK ANDREW

Defendant Attorneys

WILLIAMSON IAN G.

RIDLEY SHAWN MICHAEL

BERKES ROBERT H.

SCADDEN JAMES G

WEAKLEY HEATHER L.

SCHIRM BARRY R.

BAIME COLLEEN ELIZABETH

MCCALL MICHAEL T.

KHARE VIIU SPANGLER

NICHOLS STEPHEN MATTHEW

POND FRANCIS D.

DEJARDIN BRADFORD J.

SHARP GARY DAVID

GOLDBERG ALAN SCOTT

MCCORMICK JENNIFER M

 

Court Documents

Motion for Order - MOTION FOR ORDER GRANTING PREFERENCE IN SETTING CASE FOR TRIAL

6/21/2019: Motion for Order - MOTION FOR ORDER GRANTING PREFERENCE IN SETTING CASE FOR TRIAL

Notice - NOTICE OF DEATH

9/10/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF DEATH

Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NOT ENTERED

9/10/2019: Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NOT ENTERED

Answer - DEFENDANT PNEUMO ABEX LLC'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURIES

8/16/2019: Answer - DEFENDANT PNEUMO ABEX LLC'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURIES

Request for Dismissal

7/25/2019: Request for Dismissal

Answer - DEFENDANT WF HAYWARD COMPANY'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURIES (ASBESTOS); NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR JURY TRIAL

8/1/2019: Answer - DEFENDANT WF HAYWARD COMPANY'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURIES (ASBESTOS); NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR JURY TRIAL

Reply - REPLY TO DEFENDANT E.F. BRADY COMPANY, INC.'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR ORDER GRANTING PREFERENCE IN SETTING CASE FOR TRIAL

7/12/2019: Reply - REPLY TO DEFENDANT E.F. BRADY COMPANY, INC.'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR ORDER GRANTING PREFERENCE IN SETTING CASE FOR TRIAL

Joinder - DEFENDANT PNEUMO ABEX LLC'S JOINDER TO DEFENDANT E.F. BRADY COMPANY, INC.'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR TRIAL PREFERENCE PURSUANT TO CCP 36

7/8/2019: Joinder - DEFENDANT PNEUMO ABEX LLC'S JOINDER TO DEFENDANT E.F. BRADY COMPANY, INC.'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR TRIAL PREFERENCE PURSUANT TO CCP 36

Joinder - DEFENDANTS CERTAINTEED CORPORATION, DCO LLC, AND UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION'S JOINDER IN DEFENDANTS E.F. BRADY COMPANY, INC. AND OTHER DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR ORDER G

7/8/2019: Joinder - DEFENDANTS CERTAINTEED CORPORATION, DCO LLC, AND UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION'S JOINDER IN DEFENDANTS E.F. BRADY COMPANY, INC. AND OTHER DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR ORDER G

Proof of Personal Service

6/7/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

5/21/2019: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Clerk of Court Notice of Clerical Error and Correction - CLERK OF COURT NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR AND CORRECTION (RE: NEW ENGLAND LEAD BURNING COMPANY, INC.)

4/24/2019: Clerk of Court Notice of Clerical Error and Correction - CLERK OF COURT NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR AND CORRECTION (RE: NEW ENGLAND LEAD BURNING COMPANY, INC.)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/29/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

4/18/2019: Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

4/22/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) - PROOF OF MAILING (SUBSTITUTED SERVICE) RE SUMMONS TO PAREX USA, INC.

4/16/2019: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) - PROOF OF MAILING (SUBSTITUTED SERVICE) RE SUMMONS TO PAREX USA, INC.

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

4/16/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/9/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

107 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Gerald Rost (Plaintiff); Patricia Rost (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 15, David S. Cunningham, Presiding; Jury Trial ((Re Rost-19STCV12127)) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 15, David S. Cunningham, Presiding; Final Status Conference ((Re Rost-19STCV12127)) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by Dana Companies, LLC (Defendant); DCo LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 15, David S. Cunningham, Presiding; Further Status Conference ((Re Rost-19STCV12127)) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Gerald Rost (Plaintiff); Patricia Rost (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Gerald Rost (Plaintiff); Patricia Rost (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by CalPortland Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • DocketClerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
105 More Docket Entries
  • 04/18/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service (of Summons and Complaint); Filed by Gerald Rost (Plaintiff); Patricia Rost (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service (of Summons and Complaint); Filed by Gerald Rost (Plaintiff); Patricia Rost (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Gerald Rost (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Gerald Rost (Plaintiff); Patricia Rost (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • DocketProof of Mailing (Substituted Service) (re Summons to Parex USA, Inc.); Filed by Gerald Rost (Plaintiff); Patricia Rost (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint for Personal Injuries; Filed by Gerald Rost (Plaintiff); Patricia Rost (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Gerald Rost (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Gerald Rost (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GENERAL GROWTH PROPERTIES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where W.F. HAYWARD COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where E.F. BRADY COMPANY INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where JONES AND JONES MGMT GROUP INC. is a litigant