Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/23/2021 at 08:19:12 (UTC).

GERALD ESPINOZA VS CECIL E. BERKLEY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/20/2021 GERALD ESPINOZA filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CECIL E BERKLEY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2240

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ESPINOZA GERALD

Defendants

U-HAUL CO. OF CALIFORNIA

BERKLEY CECIL E.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

LEVY LAWRENCE

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

2/16/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

PI General Order

2/16/2021: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/20/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/20/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/20/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

1/20/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2024
  • Hearing01/17/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • Hearing07/20/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • Hearing07/06/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Gerald Espinoza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Gerald Espinoza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Gerald Espinoza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U-HAUL CO. OF CALIFORNIA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEVY LAWRENCE