This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/15/2021 at 05:18:18 (UTC).

GERALD D. TORRES, ET AL. VS FORD MOTOR COMPANY

Case Summary

On 04/21/2020 GERALD D TORRES filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FORD MOTOR COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5149

  • Filing Date:

    04/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TORRES GERALD D.

TORRES LAUREN M.

Defendants

FORD MOTOR COMPANY

WORTHINGTON FORD INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HOROWITZ DEBORAH

Defendant Attorney

HUGRET SPENCER P.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

2/8/2021: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

2/10/2021: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

12/18/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

Case Management Statement

10/23/2020: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

10/23/2020: Case Management Statement

Notice of Settlement

10/28/2020: Notice of Settlement

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER AFTER NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT;) OF 10/29/2020

10/29/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER AFTER NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT;) OF 10/29/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

10/2/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 10/02/2020

10/2/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 10/02/2020

Answer

7/14/2020: Answer

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/18/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Amended Complaint

5/18/2020: Amended Complaint

Answer

5/20/2020: Answer

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/12/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

4/22/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/21/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/21/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

4/21/2020: Complaint

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 24; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by Ford Motor Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Gerald D. Torres (Plaintiff); Lauren M. Torres (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 24; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 24; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 24; Order to Show Cause Re: (Sanctions, including dismissal, for Plaintiff's Failure to Appear at the CMC) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • Docketat 09:23 AM in Department 24; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order After Notice of Settlement;) of 10/29/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order After Notice of Settlement;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Ford Motor Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Ford Motor Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Gerald D. Torres (Plaintiff); Lauren M. Torres (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketAmended Complaint (1st); Filed by Gerald D. Torres (Plaintiff); Gerald D. Torres (Plaintiff); Lauren M. Torres (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Gerald D. Torres (Plaintiff); Lauren M. Torres (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Gerald D. Torres (Plaintiff); Lauren M. Torres (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Gerald D. Torres (Plaintiff); Lauren M. Torres (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Gerald D. Torres (Plaintiff); Lauren M. Torres (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Worthington Ford Inc., is a litigant

Latest cases where Ford Motor Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HOROWITZ DEBORAH