This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/20/2022 at 17:36:09 (UTC).

GERALD CHAMALES VS QUANTS INVESTMENT TECHNOLOGIES, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/28/2021 GERALD CHAMALES filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against QUANTS INVESTMENT TECHNOLOGIES, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DEIRDRE HILL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0403

  • Filing Date:

    05/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DEIRDRE HILL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHAMALES GERALD

Defendants

QUANTS INC.

KISACIKOGLU GOKHAN

QUANTS INVESTMENT TECHNOLOGIES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAMB STEVEN A

Defendant Attorney

FEASBY JEFFREY

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE OF FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

1/4/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

1/4/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

10/28/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Answer

10/28/2021: Answer

Notice of Trial

12/7/2021: Notice of Trial

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

12/7/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Continuance

9/24/2021: Notice of Continuance

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO CONTINUE ANSWER; CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERE...)

10/1/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO CONTINUE ANSWER; CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERE...)

Notice of Ruling

10/4/2021: Notice of Ruling

Case Management Statement

9/17/2021: Case Management Statement

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO CONTINUE

9/20/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO CONTINUE

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF STEVEN A. LAMB IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

8/31/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF STEVEN A. LAMB IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF GERALD CHAMALES IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

8/31/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF GERALD CHAMALES IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

9/1/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

9/15/2021: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

9/15/2021: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Motion to Continue - MOTION TO CONTINUE ANSWER

8/4/2021: Motion to Continue - MOTION TO CONTINUE ANSWER

Stipulation for Judgment

7/6/2021: Stipulation for Judgment

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2022
  • Hearing06/07/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department M at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M, Deirdre Hill, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketNotice of Further Case Management Conference And Trial Setting Conference; Filed by Gerald Chamales (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M, Deirdre Hill, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Trial; Filed by Gerald Chamales (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by QUANTS INVESTMENT TECHNOLOGIES, INC. (Defendant); QUANTS, INC. (Defendant); Gokhan Kisacikoglu (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by QUANTS INVESTMENT TECHNOLOGIES, INC. (Defendant); QUANTS, INC. (Defendant); Gokhan Kisacikoglu (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Gerald Chamales (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketStipulation for Judgment; Filed by Gerald Chamales (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Gerald Chamales (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Gerald Chamales (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Gerald Chamales (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause (Hearing); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Gerald Chamales (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Gerald Chamales (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Gerald Chamales (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

b'

Case Number: *******0403 Hearing Date: October 1, 2021 Dept: M

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Southwest District

Torrance Dept. M

GERALD CHAMALES,

Plaintiff,

Case No.:

*******0403

vs.

[Tentative] RULING

QUANTS INVESTMENT TECHNOLOGIES, INC., et al.,

Defendants.

Hearing Date: October 1, 2021

Moving Parties: Defendant Gokhan Kisacikoglu

Responding Party: Plaintiff Gerald Chamales

Motion to Continue (Answer)

The court considered the moving and opposition papers.

RULING

The motion is GRANTED. Defendants are to file their answers by November 1, 2021. No request for entry of judgment is to be entered before that date.

BACKGROUND

On May 28, 2021, Gerald Chamales filed a complaint against Quants Investment Technologies, Inc., Quants, Inc., and Gokhan Kisacikoglu for breach of contract and common counts.

DISCUSSION

Defendant Gokhan Kisacikoglu (self-represented) requests that the court provide defendants with a 30-day extension to file an answer.

Defendant contends that the reasons for his request are that he “will supplement the record of the proceeding by filing the partnership agreement that was signed in 2016)”; plaintiff’s purported actions in 2016 that “caused immense delays and damage to the Defendants’ business”; defendant does not remember signing a stipulated judgment; defendant was “outside of United States when he was allegedly served the court filing”; the lawsuit was filed while defendant was out of the country and learned about the lawsuit against defendants in early July upon his return to the U.S. and has “struggled to hire an attorney and put together a complete defense due to the complexity of the case”; and the company defendants cannot file an answer until they obtain an attorney.

In opposition, plaintiff argues that there is no ground for granting the motion. Plaintiff also asserts that he is entitled to judgment pursuant to a stipulation entered into in 2017.

Defendants Quants were served on June 2, 2021. Defendant Kisacikoglu was served on June 11, 2021. Defaults have not been entered against defendants.

As it appears that defendants have had challenges in retaining an attorney and that corporate defendants are unable to represent themselves, the motion is GRANTED.

Defendants are allowed an additional 30 days from the date of the hearing to file their answers.

The court notes that it does not have jurisdiction over the defendants to enter a stipulated judgment, as they have not answered or been defaulted.

Plaintiff is ordered to give notice of the ruling.

'


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where QUANTS INC. is a litigant