This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/05/2019 at 04:09:29 (UTC).

GEOVANI BAEZ TABON VS PRICESS TEONNA DESTINY ARNOLD ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/04/2018 GEOVANI BAEZ TABON filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PRICESS TEONNA DESTINY ARNOLD. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JON R. TAKASUGI. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8673

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

TABON GEOVANI BAEZ

Defendants and Respondents

ARNOLD PRICESS TEONNA DESTINY

DOES 1 TO 20

LOS ANGELES COUNTY METRO TRANSIT AUTHORIT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF BARBARA M. RODRIGUEZ

RODRIGUEZ BARBARA MARIA

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

6/4/2018: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

SUMMONS -

6/4/2018: SUMMONS -

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

9/10/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

11/18/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (JURY TRIAL) OF 12/04/2019

12/4/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (JURY TRIAL) OF 12/04/2019

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)

12/4/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Jury Trial) of 12/04/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Jury Trial)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Geovani Baez Tabon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer RODRIGUEZ BARBARA MARIA