This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/28/2019 at 01:46:23 (UTC).

GEORGIO MIKE STEVENS ET AL VS THOMAS K GREER

Case Summary

On 03/15/2018 a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury case was filed by GEORGIO MIKE STEVENS against THOMAS K GREER in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6726

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

GEORGINA T. RIZK

 

Party Details

Defendants and Respondents

GREER THOMAS K.

DOES 1 TO 10

GREER DANIEL DOE 1

THE ESTATE OF THOMAS KNOX GREER

ESTATE OF THOMAS KNOX GREER

GREER DOE 5 DOROTHY E.

Guardian Ad Litem

SHEDAKER KATHALENA

Minor

STEVENS GEORGIO MIKE

 

Court Documents

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM?CIVIL EX PARTE

5/23/2018: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM?CIVIL EX PARTE

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM?CIVIL

6/11/2018: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM?CIVIL

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

8/30/2018: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

8/30/2018: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

Association of Attorney

9/28/2018: Association of Attorney

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

11/13/2018: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

11/13/2018: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

11/13/2018: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Motion for Summary Judgment

5/24/2019: Motion for Summary Judgment

Request for Judicial Notice

5/24/2019: Request for Judicial Notice

Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

5/30/2019: Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

Request for Judicial Notice

5/30/2019: Request for Judicial Notice

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

6/7/2019: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

6/7/2019: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Informal Discovery Conference

6/26/2019: Informal Discovery Conference

NOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

4/16/2018: NOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM?CIVIL

4/16/2018: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM?CIVIL

NOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

3/28/2018: NOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2019
  • at 11:00 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts; Filed by Georgio Mike Stevens (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • Informal Discovery Conference; Filed by Greer, Daniel (DOE 1) (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Georgio Mike Stevens (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Georgio Mike Stevens (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Greer, Daniel (DOE 1) (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses; Filed by Georgio Mike Stevens (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses; Filed by Georgio Mike Stevens (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • Separate Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 04/16/2018
  • NOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • NOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • Application ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • Request-Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by Guardian

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • Request to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC696726    Hearing Date: March 13, 2020    Dept: 29

G. Stevens, a minor,  et al   vs.   Greer

COURT ORDER

On the Court's own motion, the Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise Filed by Petitioner/Guardian Ad Litem, Terry Stevens, as to Minor Claimant Georgio Stevens scheduled for 03/13/2020 is CONTINUED to 03/25/2020 at 01:30 PM in Department 29 at Spring Street Courthouse.

Counsel for Plaintiff/Petitioner is ordered to give notice.