This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/09/2021 at 12:32:38 (UTC).

GEORGINA TARRY VS CASTLE ROCK REALTY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/24/2020 GEORGINA TARRY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CASTLE ROCK REALTY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM F. FAHEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5172

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM F. FAHEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TARRY GEORGINA

Defendants

CASTLE ROCK REALTY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

RAPAELIAN PIERRE K.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SADIGH JAMES K.

Defendant Attorney

SHAPIRO MARC S

 

Court Documents

Notice of Ruling

9/27/2021: Notice of Ruling

Notice - NOTICE OF POST MEDIATION CONFERENCE

8/25/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF POST MEDIATION CONFERENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE)

8/25/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE (CCP 430.10))

4/23/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE (CCP 430.10))

Case Management Order

3/26/2021: Case Management Order

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE)

3/8/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE)

Case Management Statement

3/8/2021: Case Management Statement

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF JAMES K. SADIGH RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING NOT PROVIDING COURTESY COPY OF THE COMPLAINT

3/8/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF JAMES K. SADIGH RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING NOT PROVIDING COURTESY COPY OF THE COMPLAINT

Notice of Ruling

3/8/2021: Notice of Ruling

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE) OF 03/08/2021

3/8/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE) OF 03/08/2021

Declaration - DECLARATION OF COUNSEL IN SUPPORT OF HEARING ON OSC RE SANCTIONS

3/19/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF COUNSEL IN SUPPORT OF HEARING ON OSC RE SANCTIONS

Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

3/26/2021: Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

3/26/2021: Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS)

3/26/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

2/9/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

2/9/2021: Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/24/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/25/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2022
  • Hearing01/10/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 69 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • Hearing12/08/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 69 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • Hearing12/08/2021 at 09:30 AM in Department 69 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 69, William F. Fahey, Presiding; Post-Mediation Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Georgina Tarry (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 69, William F. Fahey, Presiding; Post-Mediation Status Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketNotice (OF POST MEDIATION CONFERENCE); Filed by Georgina Tarry (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Castle Rock Realty, a California corporation (Defendant); Pierre K. Rapaelian (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 02/09/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 69, William F. Fahey, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketDemurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Filed by Castle Rock Realty, a California corporation (Defendant); Pierre K. Rapaelian (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketMotion to Strike (not initial pleading); Filed by Castle Rock Realty, a California corporation (Defendant); Pierre K. Rapaelian (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Georgina Tarry (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Georgina Tarry (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Georgina Tarry (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CASTLE ROCK REALTY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SADIGH JAMES K.