This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/02/2021 at 01:23:30 (UTC).

GEORGINA RUIZ ROMERO VS SEIR ROBINSON HAVANA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/01/2021 GEORGINA RUIZ ROMERO filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against SEIR ROBINSON HAVANA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DENNIS J. LANDIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2539

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DENNIS J. LANDIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RUIZ ROMERO GEORGINA

Defendants

THE SEIR ROBINSON HAVANA REVOCABLE TRUST

VARGAS ROBERTO

VARGAS ROBERTO AS CO-TRUSTEE OF THE SEIR ROBINSON HAVANA REVOCABLE TRUST

AGUILAR EDWIN

HAVANA SEIR ROBINSON AS CO-TRUSTEE OF THE SEIR ROBINSON HAVANA REVOCABLE TRUST

AGUILAR EDWIN AS CO-TRUSTEE OF THE SEIR ROBINSON HAVANA REVOCABLE TRUST

HAVANA SEIR ROBINSON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

YARDLEY DAVID R

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

11/22/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

11/24/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

8/25/2021: Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

Order for Publication

8/25/2021: Order for Publication

Proof of Personal Service

8/23/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Application for Publication

8/17/2021: Application for Publication

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

8/18/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

8/19/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

8/10/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Case Management Statement

8/10/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

8/11/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

8/12/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

8/13/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Proof of Personal Service

5/17/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/1/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

4/1/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/1/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/1/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2021
  • Hearing12/02/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 51 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Georgina Ruiz Romero (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketNotice (of case reassignment and order for plaintiff to give notice); Filed by Georgina Ruiz Romero (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketOrder for Publication; Filed by Georgina Ruiz Romero (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection of Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Georgina Ruiz Romero (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketNotice (OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE); Filed by Georgina Ruiz Romero (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 51, Dennis J. Landin, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Georgina Ruiz Romero (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Georgina Ruiz Romero (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Georgina Ruiz Romero (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Georgina Ruiz Romero (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Georgina Ruiz Romero (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Georgina Ruiz Romero (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Georgina Ruiz Romero (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer YARDLEY DAVID R. ESQ.