This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/19/2019 at 00:32:11 (UTC).

GEORGINA LINDSEY VS EDGEWATER TOWERS CONDOMINIUMS HOMEOWNER

Case Summary

On 09/11/2017 GEORGINA LINDSEY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against EDGEWATER TOWERS CONDOMINIUMS HOMEOWNER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JON R. TAKASUGI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5653

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LINDSEY GEORGINA

Defendant

EDGEWATER TOWERS COCDOMINIUMS HOMEOWNER'S

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BISETTI RICHARD L. ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

TOOHEY JOHN HENRI

BRISCOE JOSEPH JACKSON IV

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR PERSONAL INJURIES

9/11/2017: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR PERSONAL INJURIES

SUMMONS

9/11/2017: SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

12/11/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

EDGWATER TOWERS CONDOMINIUMS HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION'S ANSWER TO THE COMPLAINT

12/18/2017: EDGWATER TOWERS CONDOMINIUMS HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION'S ANSWER TO THE COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/13/2019
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Edgewater Towers Cocdominiums Homeowner's (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • DocketNotice (OFF CALENDAR NOTICE FOR 7/18/19 HEARING OF MOTION FOR TRIAL CONTINUANCE); Filed by Edgewater Towers Cocdominiums Homeowner's (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (to continue trial) - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • DocketEx Parte Application (to Continue Trial; Memorandum of Points and Authoriteis); Filed by Edgewater Towers Cocdominiums Homeowner's (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to continue trial)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • DocketMotion to Continue Trial Date; Filed by Edgewater Towers Cocdominiums Homeowner's (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • DocketOrder (Proposed Order); Filed by Edgewater Towers Cocdominiums Homeowner's (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • DocketNotice of Deposit - Jury; Filed by Georgina Lindsey (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • DocketNotice of Deposit - Jury; Filed by Edgewater Towers Cocdominiums Homeowner's (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 12/27/2018
  • DocketOrder (By the Court granting Defendant's ex parte to continue trial and related dates); Filed by Edgewater Towers Cocdominiums Homeowner's (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/24/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (Ex Parte to Continue Trial) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • DocketNotice (Of Change Of Address); Filed by Georgina Lindsey (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • DocketEDGWATER TOWERS CONDOMINIUMS HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION'S ANSWER TO THE COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Edgewater Towers Cocdominiums Homeowner's (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Georgina Lindsey (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR PERSONAL INJURIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Georgina Lindsey (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****5653    Hearing Date: November 04, 2019    Dept: 3

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

GEORGINA LINDSEY,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

EDGEWATER TOWERS CONDOMINIUMS HOMEOWER’S ASSOCIATION, ET AL.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

Case No.: ****5653

[TENTATIVE] ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT

Dept. 3

1:30 p.m.

November 4, 2019

Plaintiff, Georgina Lindsey filed this action against Defendant, Edgewater Towers Condominiums Homeowner’s Association for damages arising out of a trip and fall.

On 9/03/19 and 9/05/19, the parties signed a settlement agreement pursuant to which Defendant agreed to pay Plaintiff $250,000 within thirty days. On 10/10/19, Plaintiff filed the motion to enforce the settlement per CCP ;664.6, contending Defendant had not delivered the funds. CCP ;664.6 provides, “If parties to pending litigation stipulate, in a writing signed by the parties outside the presence of the court or orally before the court, for settlement of the case, or part thereof, the court, upon motion, may enter judgment pursuant to the terms of the settlement. If requested by the parties, the court may retain jurisdiction over the parties to enforce the settlement until performance in full of the terms of the settlement.”

Plaintiff provides evidence that Defendant entered into a settlement agreement, which it personally signed, obligating it to pay $250,000 by 10/05/19, but it failed to honor the agreement. Plaintiff therefore seeks entry of judgment against Defendant in the total amount of $252,861.65, ($2,800 in attorney fees and $61.65 in court fees) with interest accruing at the rate of 10% from date of judgment forward.

Any opposition to the motion was due on or before 10/22/19. The Court has not received opposition to the motion. Plaintiff met her moving burden to show the parties have a written settlement agreement and Defendant is in breach. Defendants failed to oppose and therefore failed to show any defense to entry of judgment. The motion is therefore granted in its entirety.

Plaintiff is ordered to submit a judgment for review and processing.

Plaintiff is ordered to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept3@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.  If the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar. If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative.



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EDGEWATER TOWERS CONDOMINIUMS HOMEOWNER'S is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRISCOE, J JACKSON, IV

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TOOHEY JOHN H.