This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/21/2021 at 11:02:02 (UTC).

GEORGE, ROGER ALLYN VS MONTGOMERY, JODI PAIS

Case Summary

On 11/12/2019 GEORGE, ROGER ALLYN filed a Personal Injury - Elder/Dependant Adult Abuse lawsuit against MONTGOMERY, JODI PAIS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are STINN, JOSH FREEMAN and DORDI, FIRDAUS F. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1752

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Elder/Dependant Adult Abuse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

STINN, JOSH FREEMAN

DORDI, FIRDAUS F

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GEORGE ROGER ALLYN

Respondent

MONTGOMERY JODI PAIS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2020
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department J, Dordi, Firdaus F, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Dismissed - TRO-Lack of Prosecution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Mail (MAILED 1-08-20: (Item-4b) to Jodi Pais Montgomery - DEFECTIVE, WRONG PROOF OF SERVICE FORM. ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department J, Stinn, Josh Freeman, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued, TRO Reissued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department J, Dordi, Firdaus F, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Not Held - Continued by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketMiscellaneous (Civil Case Cover Sheet Addendum ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (Notice Given); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109) (NO TEMPORARY ORDERS ISSUED PENDING FULL HEARING ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketPetition - Elder/Dependent Adult Abuse; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less