Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/28/2021 at 00:09:11 (UTC).

GEORGE MILLER, A INDIVIDUAL VS KATHRYN PERRIGUE, AN INDIVIDUAL

Case Summary

On 10/23/2020 GEORGE MILLER, A INDIVIDUAL filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against KATHRYN PERRIGUE, AN INDIVIDUAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0656

  • Filing Date:

    10/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MILLER GEORGE A INDIVIDUAL

Defendant

PERRIGUE KATHRYN AN INDIVIDUAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

STONE JASON M.

SLATER BLAKE S.

Defendant Attorneys

MILLER RICHARD T

MIYAMOTO RONALD K

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement

3/11/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

3/12/2021: Case Management Statement

Substitution of Attorney

12/15/2020: Substitution of Attorney

Proof of Personal Service

11/10/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

11/10/2020: Answer

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/23/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/23/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/23/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/23/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

10/23/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Kathryn Perrigue, an individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by George Miller, a individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Kathryn Perrigue, an individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Kathryn Perrigue, an individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by George Miller, a individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by George Miller, a individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by George Miller, a individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by George Miller, a individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MIYAMOTO RONALD K

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MILLER RICHARD T