This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/05/2019 at 08:58:11 (UTC).

GEORGE MICHAEL CANDELAS VS MANUEL NGUYEN DDS ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/26/2017 GEORGE MICHAEL CANDELAS filed an Other lawsuit against MANUEL NGUYEN DDS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGINA T. RIZK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0057

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GEORGINA T. RIZK

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

CANDELAS GEORGE MICHAEL

Defendants and Respondents

HO KELLY DDSD

NGUYEN MANUEL DDS

DOES 1 TO 10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

SINA REZA ESQ.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR [DENTAL MALPRACTICE]: 1. NEGLIGENCE; 2. BATTERY.

7/26/2017: COMPLAINT FOR [DENTAL MALPRACTICE]: 1. NEGLIGENCE; 2. BATTERY.

SUMMONS

7/26/2017: SUMMONS

Unknown

5/22/2019: Unknown

Minute Order

5/22/2019: Minute Order

Declaration

5/15/2019: Declaration

Unknown

4/17/2019: Unknown

Minute Order

4/17/2019: Minute Order

Proof of Personal Service

4/16/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/16/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Minute Order

1/9/2019: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (ReResponse by Defendants or Entry of Default) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (- Order to Show Cause Re: Re: Response by Defendants or Entry...) of 05/22/2019); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (- Order to Show Cause Re: Re: Response by Defendants or Entry...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (of Katerina Shaller, Esq. re Inability to Meet and Confer Regarding Plaintiff's Complaint [CCP Section 430.41]); Filed by Manuel DDS Nguyen (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service; Tri...) of 04/17/2019); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service; Tri...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by George Michael Candelas (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by George Michael Candelas (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ((Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR [DENTAL MALPRACTICE]: 1. NEGLIGENCE; 2. BATTERY.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by George Michael Candelas (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****0057    Hearing Date: October 31, 2019    Dept: 2

Candelas v. Nguyen, DDS

Four (4) Motions by Defendant, Manuel Nguyen, for Order Compelling Plaintiff’s Verified Responses to Form interrogatories, Set One; Special interrogatories, Set One; Request for Production of Documents, Set One; and Statement of Damages; Request for Sanctions, filed on 10/04/2019, are GRANTED.

Plaintiff, George Candelas, is ordered to provide verified responses to Form interrogatories, Set One; Special interrogatories, Set One; Request for Production of Documents, Set One; and Statement of Damages, without objections within 10 days. Cal Code Civ Procedure ; 2030.290(b), ; 2031.300(b), ; 425.11(b). Untimely responses result in a waiver of objections.  Cal. Code Civil Procedure ;2030.290(a), ; 2031.300(a).

Imposition of sanctions against Plaintiff is warranted for the failure to timely respond to authorized methods of discovery, which is discovery abuse. Cal Code Civil Procedure ; 2023.010(d).

Accordingly, the Court imposes total sanctions of $1,000 for all four motions against Plaintiff.

The Moving Party is ordered to give notice.



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SINA REZA