This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/13/2022 at 12:49:26 (UTC).

GEORGE KRISAN, ET AL. VS SHARON L. RIEDENAUER

Case Summary

On 04/23/2019 GEORGE KRISAN, filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SHARON L RIEDENAUER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WENDY CHANG. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0307

  • Filing Date:

    04/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WENDY CHANG

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KRISAN QIAO

KRISAN GEORGE

Defendant

RIEDENAUER SHARON L.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MILLARD MARK EVANS ESQ.

PAYNE BRYAN CLAYTON ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

SHAFFER CARMIN KAYE

 

Court Documents

Notice of Settlement

5/12/2021: Notice of Settlement

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

5/13/2021: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Request for Dismissal

5/25/2021: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

7/27/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

2/20/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

4/16/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: ADVANCEMENT)

4/23/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: ADVANCEMENT)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: ADVANCEMENT) OF 04/23/2020

4/23/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: ADVANCEMENT) OF 04/23/2020

Notice - NOTICE OF CHANGE OF LEAD HANDLING ATTORNEY

10/3/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF CHANGE OF LEAD HANDLING ATTORNEY

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

8/12/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

Notice - NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY

8/13/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

8/1/2019: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Answer

6/5/2019: Answer

Notice - NOTICE OF CHANGE OF LEAD HANDLING ATTORNEY

6/5/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF CHANGE OF LEAD HANDLING ATTORNEY

Proof of Personal Service

5/10/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/23/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/23/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/23/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A15, Wendy Chang, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A15, Wendy Chang, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A15, Wendy Chang, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by George Krisan (Plaintiff); Qiao Krisan (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by George Krisan (Plaintiff); Qiao Krisan (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A15, Wendy Chang, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A15, Wendy Chang, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A15, Wendy Chang, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 08/13/2019
  • DocketNotice (of Change of Handling Attorney); Filed by George Krisan (Plaintiff); Qiao Krisan (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • DocketNotice (of Case Reassignment); Filed by George Krisan (Plaintiff); Qiao Krisan (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • DocketNotice (OF CHANGE OF LEAD HANDLING ATTORNEY); Filed by Sharon L. Riedenauer (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Sharon L. Riedenauer (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by George Krisan (Plaintiff); Qiao Krisan (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by George Krisan (Plaintiff); Qiao Krisan (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by George Krisan (Plaintiff); Qiao Krisan (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by George Krisan (Plaintiff); Qiao Krisan (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Shaffer, Carmin K