This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/14/2022 at 09:00:32 (UTC).

GEORGE I. ROSENTHAL, TRUSTEE OF THE GEORGE I. ROSENTHAL INVESTMENT TRUST OF 1998, DATED JULY 10, 1998 VS WINTERS-SCHRAM ASSOCIATES, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/27/2019 GEORGE I ROSENTHAL, TRUSTEE OF THE GEORGE I ROSENTHAL INVESTMENT TRUST OF 1998, DATED JULY 10, 1998 filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against WINTERS-SCHRAM ASSOCIATES, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1174

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GEORGE I. ROSENTHAL TRUSTEE OF THE GEORGE I. ROSENTHAL INVESTMENT TRUST OF 1998

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

TIC MANAGEMENT LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

WINTERS-SCHRAM ASSOCIATES A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

NAVIGATORS SPECIALTY INSURANCE CO.

547 PBR LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

GHANDOUR ZIAD

MALCOLM DRILLING CO INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DOE 3

WEBER-MADGWICK EXCAVATING INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DOE 2

Cross Plaintiffs and Defendants

547 PBR LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

GHANDOUR ZIAD

MALCOLM DRILLING CO INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DOE 3

WEBER-MADGWICK EXCAVATING INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DOE 2

Cross Defendants

WEBER-MADWICK EXCAVATING INC.

MALCOM DRILLING CO. INC.

TOES 1 THROUGH 100 INCLUSIVE

ROES 1 - 25

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FENSTER STEPHEN MICHAEL

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

GRANATA VALERIA

NOLAN PAUL J

RUDMAN BRUCE

STERLING SCOTT J

BLANK BESS

RHODES BRIAN WESLEY

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

3/16/2020: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

3/17/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Request for Dismissal

3/17/2020: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

3/6/2020: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

2/25/2020: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

2/24/2020: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Notice - NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

2/14/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

Answer

1/24/2020: Answer

Cross-Complaint

1/24/2020: Cross-Complaint

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

1/24/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

1/27/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Association of Attorney

1/8/2020: Association of Attorney

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT OF DEFENDANT MALCOLM DRILLING COMPANY, INC. NAMED AS DOE 3 IN PLTF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT; AND, FOR AN ORDER ALLOWING THE APP

1/2/2020: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT OF DEFENDANT MALCOLM DRILLING COMPANY, INC. NAMED AS DOE 3 IN PLTF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT; AND, FOR AN ORDER ALLOWING THE APP

Substitution of Attorney

1/7/2020: Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney

12/26/2019: Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney

12/26/2019: Substitution of Attorney

Answer - ANSWER OF WEBER-MADGWICK EXCAVATING, INC. TO COMPLAINT (SUED HEREIN AS DOE NO. 2)

12/11/2019: Answer - ANSWER OF WEBER-MADGWICK EXCAVATING, INC. TO COMPLAINT (SUED HEREIN AS DOE NO. 2)

Cross-Complaint

12/11/2019: Cross-Complaint

45 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/27/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Malcolm Drilling, Co, Inc., a California corporation (DOE 3) (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Weber-Madgwick Excavating, Inc., a California corporation (DOE 2) (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by 547 PBR LLC, A California Limited Liability Company (Cross-Complainant); Ziad Ghandour (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by George I. Rosenthal, Trustee of the George I. Rosenthal Investment Trust of 1998, dated July 10, 1998 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
47 More Docket Entries
  • 07/23/2019
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Chapter 7 Bankruptcy of Defendant Winters-Schram & Associates); Filed by George I. Rosenthal, Trustee of the George I. Rosenthal Investment Trust of 1998, dated July 10, 1998 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by George I. Rosenthal, Trustee of the George I. Rosenthal Investment Trust of 1998, dated July 10, 1998 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by George I. Rosenthal, Trustee of the George I. Rosenthal Investment Trust of 1998, dated July 10, 1998 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by George I. Rosenthal, Trustee of the George I. Rosenthal Investment Trust of 1998, dated July 10, 1998 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by George I. Rosenthal, Trustee of the George I. Rosenthal Investment Trust of 1998, dated July 10, 1998 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by George I. Rosenthal, Trustee of the George I. Rosenthal Investment Trust of 1998, dated July 10, 1998 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by George I. Rosenthal, Trustee of the George I. Rosenthal Investment Trust of 1998, dated July 10, 1998 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WEBER-MADGWICK EXCAVATING INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where MALCOLM DRILLING COMPANY INC; DBA : MALCOLM DRILLING CO INC is a litigant

Latest cases where WINTER SCHRAM ASSOCIATES is a litigant

Latest cases where NAVIGATORS SPECIALTY INSURANCE GROUP is a litigant