Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/29/2020 at 16:18:24 (UTC).

GEORGE BRANDOW VS CERTIFIED AVIATION SERVICES, LLC,, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/21/2020 GEORGE BRANDOW filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against CERTIFIED AVIATION SERVICES, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6026

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BRANDOW GEORGE

Defendants

LEE DAVID

LEE MARK

CERTIFIED AVIATION SERVICES LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AIN FARRIS E. ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

KANE ROBERT J.

 

Court Documents

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR TRANSFER OF VENUE OF ACTION

11/25/2020: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR TRANSFER OF VENUE OF ACTION

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER FOR TRANSFER ...) OF 11/25/2020

11/25/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER FOR TRANSFER ...) OF 11/25/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER FOR TRANSFER ...)

11/25/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER FOR TRANSFER ...)

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/28/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/21/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/21/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/21/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

9/21/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/25/2020
  • Docketat 2:00 PM in Department 73; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: Stipulation and Proposed Order for Transfer ...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketStipulation and Order (for Transfer of Venue of Action); Filed by Certified Aviation Services, LLC, (Defendant); Mark Lee (Defendant); David Lee (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Stipulation and Proposed Order for Transfer ...) of 11/25/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by George Brandow (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by George Brandow (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by George Brandow (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Certified Aviation Services, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer AIN FARRIS ELIAS