This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/17/2022 at 22:38:17 (UTC).

GEORGE BELL, AN INDIVIDUAL VS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/17/2022 GEORGE BELL, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6304

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BELL AN INDIVIDUAL GEORGE

Defendants

CITY OF POMONA A PUBLIC ENTITY

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES A PUBLIC ENTITY

LOS ANGELES DEPARTMENT OF WATER AND POWER A PUBLIC ENTITY

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BENJI DANIEL

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

5/17/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

5/17/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

5/17/2022: Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

5/17/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/17/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/17/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

5/17/2022: Complaint

Proof of Personal Service

6/8/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

6/1/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

6/1/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

5/24/2022: Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/14/2024
  • Hearing05/14/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2023
  • Hearing11/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2023
  • Hearing10/31/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by GEORGE BELL, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by GEORGE BELL, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by GEORGE BELL, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by GEORGE BELL, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by GEORGE BELL, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by GEORGE BELL, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by GEORGE BELL, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketSeventh Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CITY OF POMONA A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BENJI DANIEL ESQ.