Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/05/2021 at 07:23:32 (UTC).

GEORGE AMRAN, ET AL. VS LOUIE ARELLANO, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/22/2021 GEORGE AMRAN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against LOUIE ARELLANO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0959

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AMRAN BIATRIZ

AMRAN GEORGE

Defendants

ARRELLANO AIDE

ARELLANO LOUIE

THE LOUIE AND AIDE ARRELLANO LIVING TRUST

GEZALYAN GARY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ABB WAYNE MARK

 

Court Documents

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

4/21/2021: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Summons - SUMMONS ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

4/22/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/23/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/22/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/22/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/22/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

3/22/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2021
  • Hearing07/29/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 49 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketSummons (On First Amended Complaint); Filed by George Amran (Plaintiff); Biatriz Amran (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketAmended Complaint ( (1st)); Filed by George Amran (Plaintiff); Biatriz Amran (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by George Amran (Plaintiff); Biatriz Amran (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by George Amran (Plaintiff); Biatriz Amran (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by George Amran (Plaintiff); Biatriz Amran (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ABB WAYNE M. ESQ.