This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/20/2022 at 01:29:35 (UTC).

GEORGE ACOSTA, , ET AL. VS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/01/2022 GEORGE ACOSTA, , filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III and KENNETH R. FREEMAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8606

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III

KENNETH R. FREEMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ACOSTA GEORGE

CHRISMAN DAVID AUBREY

FERGUSON NICOLE

GONZALEZ ANTHONY

HOLZER NICHOLAS

LAM BAO AN

NGUYEN JASON

NGUYEN NATALIE

PHAM CINDY

SHABBY ROAD LLC

SHELDON LORRAINE

STACY W. MILLER AND SUSAN D. MILLER AS TRUSTEES OF THE MILLER FAMILY TRUST

TORRES BOBBIE NICOLE

WEDEEN GLENN

WEDEEN GLENN P.

WHITTLE KALIL

YSAIS JAMES III

Defendants

EDISON INTERNATIONAL

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SINGLETON GERALD

Defendant Attorney

BEHRENS MICHAEL A.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

9/1/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/1/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/1/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;) OF 09/20/2022

9/20/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;) OF 09/20/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;)

9/20/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;)

Notice of Related Case

9/22/2022: Notice of Related Case

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASES;)

9/28/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASES;)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASES;) OF 09/28/2022

9/28/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASES;) OF 09/28/2022

Proof of Service by Mail - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

10/5/2022: Proof of Service by Mail - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Notice - NOTICE OF MINUTE ORDER

10/5/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF MINUTE ORDER

Proof of Service by Mail - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

10/5/2022: Proof of Service by Mail - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF STATUS CONFERENCE;)

10/24/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF STATUS CONFERENCE;)

Answer - DEFENDANTS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONAL'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

10/28/2022: Answer - DEFENDANTS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONAL'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2022
  • Hearing12/06/2022 at 3:00 PM in Department 14 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketDefendants Southern California Edison Company and Edison International's Answer to Complaint; Filed by: Southern California Edison (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant); As to: George Acosta, (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketStatus Conference scheduled for 12/06/2022 at 03:00 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 14

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketStatus Conference scheduled for 10/27/2022 at 02:00 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 14 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 12/06/2022 03:00 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order Re: Notice of Continuance of Status Conference;)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketNotice Of Minute Order; Filed by: George Acosta, (Plaintiff); David Aubrey Chrisman, (Plaintiff); Nicole Ferguson, (Plaintiff); Anthony Gonzalez, (Plaintiff); Nicholas Holzer, (Plaintiff); Bao An Lam, (Plaintiff); Jason Nguyen, (Plaintiff); Natalie Nguyen, (Plaintiff); Cindy Pham, (Plaintiff); Shabby Road, LLC (Plaintiff); Lorraine Sheldon, (Plaintiff); Stacy W. Miller and Susan D. Miller, as trustees of the Miller Family Trust established May 1, 2019 (Plaintiff); Bobbie Nicole Torres, (Plaintiff); Glenn Wedeen (Plaintiff); Glenn P. Wedeen (Plaintiff); Kalil Whittle, (Plaintiff); James Ysais, III (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Edison (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by: George Acosta, (Plaintiff); David Aubrey Chrisman, (Plaintiff); Nicole Ferguson, (Plaintiff); Anthony Gonzalez, (Plaintiff); Nicholas Holzer, (Plaintiff); Bao An Lam, (Plaintiff); Jason Nguyen, (Plaintiff); Natalie Nguyen, (Plaintiff); Cindy Pham, (Plaintiff); Shabby Road, LLC (Plaintiff); Lorraine Sheldon, (Plaintiff); Stacy W. Miller and Susan D. Miller, as trustees of the Miller Family Trust established May 1, 2019 (Plaintiff); Bobbie Nicole Torres, (Plaintiff); Glenn Wedeen (Plaintiff); Glenn P. Wedeen (Plaintiff); Kalil Whittle, (Plaintiff); James Ysais, III (Plaintiff); As to: Edison International (Defendant); After Substituted Service of Summons and Complaint ?: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by: George Acosta, (Plaintiff); David Aubrey Chrisman, (Plaintiff); Nicole Ferguson, (Plaintiff); Anthony Gonzalez, (Plaintiff); Nicholas Holzer, (Plaintiff); Bao An Lam, (Plaintiff); Jason Nguyen, (Plaintiff); Natalie Nguyen, (Plaintiff); Cindy Pham, (Plaintiff); Shabby Road, LLC (Plaintiff); Lorraine Sheldon, (Plaintiff); Stacy W. Miller and Susan D. Miller, as trustees of the Miller Family Trust established May 1, 2019 (Plaintiff); Bobbie Nicole Torres, (Plaintiff); Glenn Wedeen (Plaintiff); Glenn P. Wedeen (Plaintiff); Kalil Whittle, (Plaintiff); James Ysais, III (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Edison (Defendant); After Substituted Service of Summons and Complaint ?: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketStatus Conference scheduled for 10/27/2022 at 02:00 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 14

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketCase numbers 22STCV28606, 22STCV28954, 20STCV42356, 22STCV28290, 22STCV28774, 22STCV27685, 22STCV28106, 22STCV29440, 22STCV29097 are related; case number 20STCV42356 is the lead case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Deemed Complex

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Stay - Deemed Complex

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re. Complex Determination;) of 09/20/2022; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order Re. Complex Determination;)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketThe case is removed from the special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketCase assigned in Department 11 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: George Acosta, (Plaintiff); David Aubrey Chrisman, (Plaintiff); Nicole Ferguson, (Plaintiff); Anthony Gonzalez, (Plaintiff); Nicholas Holzer, (Plaintiff); Bao An Lam, (Plaintiff); Jason Nguyen, (Plaintiff); Natalie Nguyen, (Plaintiff); Cindy Pham, (Plaintiff); Shabby Road, LLC (Plaintiff); Lorraine Sheldon, (Plaintiff); Stacy W. Miller and Susan D. Miller, as trustees of the Miller Family Trust established May 1, 2019 (Plaintiff); Bobbie Nicole Torres, (Plaintiff); Glenn Wedeen (Plaintiff); Glenn P. Wedeen (Plaintiff); Kalil Whittle, (Plaintiff); James Ysais, III (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Edison (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: George Acosta, (Plaintiff); David Aubrey Chrisman, (Plaintiff); Nicole Ferguson, (Plaintiff); Anthony Gonzalez, (Plaintiff); Nicholas Holzer, (Plaintiff); Bao An Lam, (Plaintiff); Jason Nguyen, (Plaintiff); Natalie Nguyen, (Plaintiff); Cindy Pham, (Plaintiff); Shabby Road, LLC (Plaintiff); Lorraine Sheldon, (Plaintiff); Stacy W. Miller and Susan D. Miller, as trustees of the Miller Family Trust established May 1, 2019 (Plaintiff); Bobbie Nicole Torres, (Plaintiff); Glenn Wedeen (Plaintiff); Glenn P. Wedeen (Plaintiff); Kalil Whittle, (Plaintiff); James Ysais, III (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Edison (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: George Acosta, (Plaintiff); David Aubrey Chrisman, (Plaintiff); Nicole Ferguson, (Plaintiff); Anthony Gonzalez, (Plaintiff); Nicholas Holzer, (Plaintiff); Bao An Lam, (Plaintiff); Jason Nguyen, (Plaintiff); Natalie Nguyen, (Plaintiff); Cindy Pham, (Plaintiff); Shabby Road, LLC (Plaintiff); Lorraine Sheldon, (Plaintiff); Stacy W. Miller and Susan D. Miller, as trustees of the Miller Family Trust established May 1, 2019 (Plaintiff); Bobbie Nicole Torres, (Plaintiff); Glenn Wedeen (Plaintiff); Glenn P. Wedeen (Plaintiff); Kalil Whittle, (Plaintiff); James Ysais, III (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Edison (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where EDISON INTERNATIONAL is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BEHRENS MICHAEL A.