This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/08/2022 at 22:18:31 (UTC).

GEORGE ABAUNZA VS WALSH SHEA CORRIDOR CONSTRUCTORS, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 10/13/2021 GEORGE ABAUNZA filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against WALSH SHEA CORRIDOR CONSTRUCTORS, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK V. MOONEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7743

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARK V. MOONEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ABAUNZA GEORGE

Defendant

WALSH SHEA CORRIDOR CONSTRUCTORS A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NATANZI O. DAVID

Defendant Attorney

CARTER KIMBERLY C.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/14/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/13/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/13/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

10/13/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/13/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/1/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/6/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

2/25/2022: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

2/3/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

2/1/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

1/21/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

1/19/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

1/11/2022: Case Management Statement

Answer

1/5/2022: Answer

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/08/2023
  • Hearing05/08/2023 at 09:30 AM in Department 68 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • Hearing04/28/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 68 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Kimberly C. Carter (Attorney)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by George Abaunza (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Walsh Shea Corridor Constructors, a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Walsh Shea Corridor Constructors, a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by George Abaunza (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Walsh Shea Corridor Constructors, a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by George Abaunza (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by George Abaunza (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by George Abaunza (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by George Abaunza (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by George Abaunza (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WALSH SHEA CORRIDOR CONSTRUCTORS A BUSINESS OF FORM UNKNOWN; is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CARTER KIMBERLY CHANTAL