This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/19/2022 at 04:00:28 (UTC).

GEORDIE WIMMER, ET AL. VS UNIVERSAL PROTECTION SERVICE, LP, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/08/2021 GEORDIE WIMMER filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against UNIVERSAL PROTECTION SERVICE, LP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1036

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LOUNSBURY HEATHER

MALIBU ENTERPRISES INC.

WIMMER GEORDIE

WIMMER NICOLE

Defendants

EDISON INTERNATIONAL

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON

THE BOEING COMPANY

UNIVERSAL PROTECTION SERVICE LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCNULTY PETER

Defendant Attorneys

HUESTON JOHN

HURWITZ DANIEL S.

HUESTON JOHN C.

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/8/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

11/8/2021: Complaint

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;) OF 11/23/2021

11/23/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;) OF 11/23/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;)

11/23/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;)

Answer - ANSWER TO COMPLAINT OF DEFENDANT, UNIVERSAL PROTECTION SERVICE, LP D/B/A ALLIED UNIVERSAL SECURITY SERVICES; REQUEST FOR JURY TRIAL

1/6/2022: Answer - ANSWER TO COMPLAINT OF DEFENDANT, UNIVERSAL PROTECTION SERVICE, LP D/B/A ALLIED UNIVERSAL SECURITY SERVICES; REQUEST FOR JURY TRIAL

Unknown - DECLARATION OF CRAIG A. FLIGOR IN SUPPORT OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONAL'S PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

1/6/2022: Unknown - DECLARATION OF CRAIG A. FLIGOR IN SUPPORT OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONAL'S PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - RE: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONAL'S PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

1/6/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - RE: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONAL'S PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

Petition to Coordinate Add-On Case (JCCP) - SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONAL'S PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

1/6/2022: Petition to Coordinate Add-On Case (JCCP) - SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONAL'S PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

Unknown - NOTICE OF SUBMISSON RE: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONAL'S PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

1/13/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF SUBMISSON RE: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONAL'S PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketNotice of Submisson Re: Southern California Edison Company and Edison International's Petition to Coordinate Add-On Case; Filed by Southern California Edison (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketSouthern California Edison Company and Edison International's Petition to Coordinate Add-on Case; Filed by Southern California Edison (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketDeclaration of Craig A. Fligor in Support of Southern California Edison Company and Edison International's Petition to Coordinate Add-On Case; Filed by Southern California Edison (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) (_Southern California Edison Company and Edison International's Petition to Coordinate Add-On Case); Filed by Southern California Edison (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint of Defendant, Universal Protection Service, LP D/B/A Allied Universal Security Services; Request for Jury Trial; Filed by Universal Protection Service, LP (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • Docketat 09:03 AM in Department 11, David S. Cunningham, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re. Complex Determination;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re. Complex Determination;) of 11/23/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Geordie Wimmer (Plaintiff); Nicole Wimmer (Plaintiff); Jake Wimmer (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Geordie Wimmer (Plaintiff); Nicole Wimmer (Plaintiff); Jake Wimmer (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNIVERSAL PROTECTION SERVICE LP is a litigant

Latest cases where EDISON INTERNATIONAL is a litigant

Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where THE BOEING COMPANY, a Delaware Corporation is a litigant